EP0011111 - 5-(4-Pyridyl)-6-(4-fluorophenyl)-2,3-dihydroimidazo-(2,1-b)-thiazole, process for its preparation and medical composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BECKMAN CORPORATION P.O. Box 7929 1 Franklin Plaza Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19101 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1980/14] | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BECKMAN CORPORATION P.O. Box 7929 1 Franklin Plaza Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19101 / US | ||
Former [1980/11] | For all designated states SmithKline Corporation 1500 Spring Garden Street P.O.Box 7929 Philadelphia, Pennsylvania / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bender, Paul Elliot 504 Lilac Lane Cherry Hill, New Jersey 08003 / US | 02 /
Lantos, Ivan 1447 Boxwood Drive Blackwood, New Jersey 08012 / US | [1980/11] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/11] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 79103659.3 | 26.09.1979 | [1980/11] | Priority number, date | US19780946260 | 27.09.1978 Original published format: US 946260 | [1980/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0011111 | Date: | 28.05.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0011111 | Date: | 22.09.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.1980 | Classification | IPC: | C07D513/04, A61K31/425, // (C07D513/04, 277:00, 235:00) | [1980/11] | CPC: |
C07D213/50 (EP,US);
A61K31/425 (EP,US);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
C07D513/04 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1980/11] | Title | German: | 5-(4-Pyridyl)-6-(4-fluorphenyl)-2,3-dihydroimidazo-(2,1-b)-thiazol, Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung und pharmazeutische Zusammensetzung | [1980/11] | English: | 5-(4-Pyridyl)-6-(4-fluorophenyl)-2,3-dihydroimidazo-(2,1-b)-thiazole, process for its preparation and medical composition | [1980/11] | French: | 5-(4-Pyridyl)-6-(4-fluorophényl)-2,3-dihydroimidazo-(2,1-b)-thiazole, procédé pour sa préparation et composition pharmaceutique | [1980/11] | Examination procedure | 17.07.1980 | Examination requested [1980/20] | 27.01.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 27.01.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.06.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [1983/50] | BE | 26.09.1982 | Documents cited: | Search | DE2709639 [ ] (METABIO FA); | DE2742725 [ ] (SMITHKLINE CORP); | EP0000353 [ ] (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) |