EP0009784 - System for driving DC motor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FANUC LTD 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1983/43] | For all designated states FANUC LTD. 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | ||
Former [1980/11] | For all designated states Fanuc Ltd 5-1, Asahigaoka, 3-chome Hino-shi, Tokyo 191 / JP | ||
Former [1980/08] | For all designated states FANUC LTD. 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawada, Shigeki 346-15, Ooaza Shimoda Hino-shi, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Fujioka, Yoshiki 3-27, Tamadaira Hino-shi, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Ohta, Naoto 3-38-9, Toyoda Hino-shi, Tokyo / JP | [1980/08] | Representative(s) | Blumbach Weser Bergen Kramer Zwirner Hoffmann Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/08] | Blumbach Weser Bergen Kramer Zwirner Hoffmann Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 D-81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 79103709.6 | 28.09.1979 | [1980/08] | Priority number, date | JP19780120374 | 02.10.1978 Original published format: JP 12037478 | [1980/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0009784 | Date: | 16.04.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0009784 | Date: | 12.01.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.1980 | Classification | IPC: | H02P5/12, H02P5/16, G05F5/00 | [1980/08] | CPC: |
H02P7/2985 (EP,US);
Y10S388/906 (EP);
Y10S388/917 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1980/08] | Title | German: | Antriebssystem für Gleichstrommotor | [1980/08] | English: | System for driving DC motor | [1980/08] | French: | Système de commande d'un moteur à courant continu | [1980/08] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 03.12.1979 | Examination requested [1980/08] | 31.07.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.07.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.10.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | CH604272 [ ] (LANDIS & GYR AG); | AT281210B [ ] (SIEMENS AG); | DE928054 [ ] (BROWN); | DE2617444 [ ] (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO) | [ ] - TECHNISCHE RUNDSCHAU, Vol. 67, No. 2, 14 January 1975, Berlin "Industrielle Antriebe mit gleichstrommotoren" pages 27, 29, 31 * Page 29, column 4, last paragraph and page 31, column 1, paragraph 1; fig. 7 * |