EP0010637 - Decaffeination process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A. Case postale 353 1800 Vevey / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1980/10] | For all designated states SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A. Case postale 353 CH-1800 Vevey / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Margolis, Geoffrey 42, chemin de la Potteilaz CH-1030 Bussigny / CH | 02 /
Chiovini, Jacky CH-1349 Daillens / CH | [1980/10] | Application number, filing date | 79103780.7 | 03.10.1979 | [1980/10] | Priority number, date | US19780957822 | 06.11.1978 Original published format: US 957822 | [1980/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0010637 | Date: | 14.05.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0010637 | Date: | 27.10.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.1980 | Classification | IPC: | A23F5/22, A23F3/38 | [1980/10] | CPC: |
A23F3/38 (EP,US);
A23F5/226 (EP,US);
B01D11/0203 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1980/10] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Entziehen von Coffein | [1980/10] | English: | Decaffeination process | [1980/10] | French: | Procédé de décaféination | [1980/10] | Examination procedure | 22.11.1979 | Examination requested [1980/10] | 16.07.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.10.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 08.04.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.07.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2140098 [ ] (HAG AG); | FR2133957 [ ] (HAG AG); | DE2638383 [ ] (D E J INT RESEARCH) |