EP0010674 - Ethene-azole derivatives, process for their preparation, fungicidal compositions and process for their preparation, use of the azole derivatives in combating fungi and process for combating fungi [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/10] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jäger, Gerhard, Dr. Gellertstrasse 18 D-5090 Leverkusen 1 / DE | 02 /
Kraatz, Udo, Dr. Körner Strasse 6 D-5090 Leverkusen 1 / DE | 03 /
Büchel, Karl Heinz, Prof., Dr. Bergerheide 62 D-5600 Wuppertal 1 / DE | 04 /
Frohberger, Paul-Ernst, Dr. Willi-Baumeister-Strasse 5 D-5090 Leverkusen 1 / DE | 05 /
Brandes, Wilhelm, Dr. Eichendorffstrasse 3 D-5653 Leichlingen 1 / DE | [1980/10] | Application number, filing date | 79103966.2 | 15.10.1979 | [1980/10] | Priority number, date | DE19782846980 | 28.10.1978 Original published format: DE 2846980 | [1980/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0010674 | Date: | 14.05.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0010674 | Date: | 27.01.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.02.1980 | Classification | IPC: | C07D249/08, C07D233/60, A01N43/50, A01N43/64 | [1980/10] | CPC: |
C07D231/12 (EP,US);
A01N43/50 (EP,US);
A01N43/653 (EP,US);
C07C45/63 (EP,US);
C07C45/71 (EP,US);
C07C49/255 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C45/63, C07C49/255 (EP,US);
C07C45/71, C07C49/175 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1980/10] | Title | German: | Neue Ethen-azol-Derivate, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung, fungizide Mittel, Verfahren zur Herstellung dieser sowie Verwendung der Azol-Derivate zur Bekämpfung von Pilzen und ein Verfahren zur Bekämpfung von Pilzen | [1980/10] | English: | Ethene-azole derivatives, process for their preparation, fungicidal compositions and process for their preparation, use of the azole derivatives in combating fungi and process for combating fungi | [1980/10] | French: | Dérivés d'éthène-azole, procédé pour leur préparation, compositions fongicides, procédé de préparation de ces compositions, utilisation des dérivés d'azole pour combattre les champignons et méthode de lutte contre les champignons | [1980/10] | Examination procedure | 02.11.1979 | Examination requested [1980/10] | 03.07.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: {0}) | 16.10.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 28.11.1980 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 27.07.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.10.1982 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3972892 [ ] (BUCHEL KARL HEINZ, et al); | DE2634511 [ ] (BASF AG); | DE2737489 [ ] (ICI LTD); | US4086351 [ ] (BALASUBRAMANYAN SUGAVANAM, et al); | DE2652313 [ ] (BASF AG) |