EP0011711 - Test device for the stepwise indication of a measurement voltage [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1980/12] | Test device for indicating an electric tension and optionally its polarity | ||
[1983/28] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.05.1984 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.07.1984 [1984/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/12] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koslar, Manfred, Dipl.-Ing. Ludwig-Uhland-Strasse 3 D-4840 Rheda-Wiedenbrück / DE | [1980/12] | Application number, filing date | 79104130.4 | 24.10.1979 | [1980/12] | Priority number, date | DE19782846675 | 26.10.1978 Original published format: DE 2846675 | [1980/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0011711 | Date: | 11.06.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0011711 | Date: | 13.07.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.1980 | Classification | IPC: | G01R13/40, G01R19/14, G01R19/155 | [1980/12] | CPC: |
G01R13/405 (EP,US);
G01R19/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1980/12] | Title | German: | Prüfeinrichtung zum stufenweisen Anzeigen einer Messspannung | [1983/28] | English: | Test device for the stepwise indication of a measurement voltage | [1983/28] | French: | Dispositif de test pour l'indication par paliers d'une tension à mesurer | [1983/28] |
Former [1980/12] | Prüfeinrichtung zum Anzeigen einer elektrischen Spannung und gegebenenfalls deren Polarität | ||
Former [1980/12] | Test device for indicating an electric tension and optionally its polarity | ||
Former [1980/12] | Dispositif de test pour afficher une tension électrique et éventuellement sa polarité | Examination procedure | 23.10.1980 | Examination requested [1981/01] | 25.06.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.02.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 02.11.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 16.11.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.04.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3555420 [ ] (SCHWARTZ HARVEY A); | DE2233765 [ ] (METRAWATT GMBH); | DE2503440 [ ] (TOBIAS MARTIN); | US4017796 [ ] (TOBIAS MARTIN B); | US4027236 [ ] (STEWART PHILLIP M) | [ ] - ELEKTOR, Band 4, Nr. 7, 8, Juli/August 1978, Beek, NL, "Car ammeter", Seite 79. * Seite 79; Abbildung * | [ ] - ELECTRONIC DESIGN NEWS, Band 22, Nr. 20, November 1977, R.A. SNYDER: "Simple polarity indicator suits DMM's of DPM's", Seite 110. * Seite 110; Abbildung * | Examination | DE2060884 | US3818495 | DE2503855 | DE2717826 |