Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | |
17.09.1982 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.11.1982 [1982/46] |
12.12.1980 | Request for examination filed | published on 11.02.1981 [1981/06] |
22.07.1980 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 17.09.1980 [1980/19] |