EP0015309 - Device for pressing an optical waveguide against a photoelectrical element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1980/19] | Device for applying an optical waveguide against a photoelectrical element | ||
[1982/46] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schaltbau Gesellschaft mbH Klausenburger Strasse 6 D-81677 München / DE | [1980/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Keller, Gerhard Alpspitzstrasse 2 D-8011 Vaterstetten / DE | [1980/19] | Representative(s) | Schneider, Ernst-Wilhelm c/o kabelmetal electro GmbH Kabelkamp 20 Postfach 260 D-3000 Hannover 1 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/19] | Schneider, Wilhelm c/o kabelmetal electro GmbH Kabelkamp 20 Postfach 260 D-3000 Hannover 1 / DE | Application number, filing date | 79104294.8 | 03.11.1979 | [1980/19] | Priority number, date | DE19792907705 | 28.02.1979 Original published format: DE 2907705 | [1980/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0015309 | Date: | 17.09.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0015309 | Date: | 17.11.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.1980 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/14 | [1980/19] | CPC: |
G02B6/4292 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, FR, GB, IT [1980/19] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Andrücken eines Lichtwellenleiters an ein photoelektrisches Bauelement | [1982/46] | English: | Device for pressing an optical waveguide against a photoelectrical element | [1982/46] | French: | Dispositif de pression d'un guide d'onde optique contre un élément photoélectrique | [1982/46] |
Former [1980/19] | Vorrichtung zum Anlegen eines Lichtwellenleiters an ein photoelektrisches Bauelement | ||
Former [1980/19] | Device for applying an optical waveguide against a photoelectrical element | ||
Former [1980/19] | Dispositif d'application d'un guide d'onde optique contre un élément photoélectrique | Examination procedure | 01.12.1980 | Examination requested [1981/06] | 15.10.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 19.04.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 18.05.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.08.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3579177 [ ] (LAWLOR ROBERT E); | [A]FR2102647 (ANVAR); | [A]US3704996 (BORNER MANFRED, et al); | US3937548 [ ] (DITTMANN LARRY EUGENE); | DE2630340 [ ] (LICENTIA GMBH) |