EP0011740 - Slide projector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.01.1981 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agfa-Gevaert AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 51373 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/21] | For all designated states Agfa-Gevaert AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee D-51373 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [1980/12] | For all designated states AGFA-GEVAERT Aktiengesellschaft Camera-Werk Patent- und Lizenzwesen Postfach D-8000 München 90 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grünbacher, Martin Burgsolmser Weg 19 D-6333 Braunfels / DE | [1980/12] | Application number, filing date | 79104360.7 | 07.11.1979 | [1980/12] | Priority number, date | DE19782849361 | 14.11.1978 Original published format: DE 2849361 | [1980/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0011740 | Date: | 11.06.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.1980 | Classification | IPC: | G03B23/02 | [1980/12] | CPC: |
G03B23/048 (EP);
G03B23/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, FR, GB, IT [1980/12] | Title | German: | Diaprojektor | [1980/12] | English: | Slide projector | [1980/12] | French: | Projecteur de diapositives | [1980/12] | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 20.03.1980 | Examination requested [1980/12] | 07.08.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: {0}) | 02.12.1980 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1981/10] | 02.12.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2147173 [ ]; | CH576154 [ ]; | US3953119 [ ] |