EP0011259 - Charge transfer apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [1980/14] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady New York 12305 / US | ||
Former [1980/11] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady New York 10022 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Engeler, William Ernst 88 St. Stephens Lane West Scotia New York / US | 02 /
Baertsch, Richard Dudley 18 Berkley Road Scotia New York / US | [1980/11] | Representative(s) | Voigt, Reinhard, et al Patentanwalt, Pfarrgasse 51 65239 Hochheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/11] | Voigt, Reinhard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwalt, Elsterweg 22 D-65812 Bad Soden / DE | Application number, filing date | 79104429.0 | 10.11.1979 | [1980/11] | Priority number, date | US19780961258 | 16.11.1978 Original published format: US 961258 | [1980/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0011259 | Date: | 28.05.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0011259 | Date: | 02.02.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.1980 | Classification | IPC: | G11C27/02, G11C19/28 | [1980/11] | CPC: |
G11C19/285 (EP,US);
G11C27/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, NL [1980/11] | Title | German: | Ladungsübertragungsvorrichtung | [1980/11] | English: | Charge transfer apparatus | [1980/11] | French: | Appareil de transfert de charges | [1980/11] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 17.11.1980 | Examination requested [1981/04] | 03.07.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 06.08.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.11.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.11.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4042835 [ ] (FULTON JAMES T); | BE861098 [ ] (ORGANISATION EUROP DE RECH S S); | US3925805 [ ] (ERB DARRELL M) |