EP0011274 - Composite material for secondary container packaging [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.05.1985 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COORS CONTAINER COMPANY 17755 West 32nd Avenue Golden Colorado / US | [N/P] |
Former [1980/11] | For all designated states COORS CONTAINER COMPANY 17755 West 32nd Avenue Golden Colorado / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Peer, Jr., Albert Dean 13239 North Winchester Way Parker Colorado / US | [1980/11] | Representative(s) | Richards, John, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Temple Chambers 3-7 Temple Avenue London EC4Y 0DA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/24] | Richards, John, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/09] | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [1985/30] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1980/11] | Baillie, Iain Cameron c/o Ladas & Parry Isartorplatz 5 D-8000 München 2 / DE | Application number, filing date | 79104455.5 | 12.11.1979 | [1980/11] | Priority number, date | US19780961955 | 20.11.1978 Original published format: US 961955 | [1980/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0011274 | Date: | 28.05.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0011274 | Date: | 24.07.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.1980 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/10, B65D65/40, B65D77/00 | [1980/11] | CPC: |
B32B27/10 (EP,US);
B32B27/16 (US);
B32B38/14 (EP,US);
B32B7/12 (US);
B65D71/14 (EP,US);
B31B2105/001 (EP,US);
B31B50/622 (EP,US);
B31B50/88 (EP,US);
B32B2255/205 (US);
B32B2310/0875 (EP,US);
B32B2553/00 (US);
B41M3/00 (EP,US);
B65D2571/00141 (EP,US);
B65D2571/00265 (EP,US);
B65D2571/00277 (EP,US);
B65D2571/00339 (EP,US);
B65D2571/00444 (EP,US);
B65D2571/0066 (EP,US);
B65D2571/00716 (EP,US);
B65D2571/0087 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24876 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24884 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24967 (EP,US);
Y10T428/3188 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1980/11] | Title | German: | Verbundmaterial für die sekundäre Verpackung von Behältern | [1980/11] | English: | Composite material for secondary container packaging | [1980/11] | French: | Matériau composite pour l'emballage secondaire de récipients | [1980/11] | Examination procedure | 24.11.1980 | Examination requested [1981/05] | 11.03.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.09.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.05.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.01.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.07.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 09.01.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
24.04.1986
25.10.1986
INADMISSIBLE UNILEVER N.V. / UNILEVER PLC Weena 455/Unilever House, 100 Victoria Embankment 3013 AL Rotterdam/London EC4Y 0DY / NL Opponent's representative Hutzelmann, Gerhard Schloss 89296 Osterberg / DE | [2015/21] |
Former [2008/32] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.04.1986
25.10.1986
INADMISSIBLE Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL Opponent's representative Hutzelmann, Gerhard Schloss 89296 Osterberg / DE | ||
Former [1987/12] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.04.1986
25.10.1986
INADMISSIBLE Unilever N.V. Burgemeester's Jacobplein 1 NL-3015 CA Rotterdam / NL Opponent's representative Hutzelmann, Gerhard Duracher Strasse 22 D-87437 Kempten / DE | ||
Former [1986/25] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.04.1986
Unilever N.V. Burgemeester's Jacobplein 1 NL-3015 CA Rotterdam / NL Opponent's representative Hutzelmann, Gerhard Duracher Strasse 22 D-87437 Kempten / DE | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.11.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 30.11.1985 | AT | 12.11.1994 | GB | 12.11.1994 | SE | 13.11.1994 | BE | 30.11.1994 | CH | 30.11.1994 | NL | 01.06.1995 | FR | 31.07.1996 | DE | 01.08.1996 | [1999/52] |
Former [1997/14] | AT | 12.11.1994 | |
GB | 12.11.1994 | ||
SE | 13.11.1994 | ||
BE | 30.11.1994 | ||
CH | 30.11.1994 | ||
NL | 01.06.1995 | ||
FR | 31.07.1996 | ||
DE | 01.08.1996 | ||
Former [1997/03] | AT | 12.11.1994 | |
GB | 12.11.1994 | ||
SE | 13.11.1994 | ||
BE | 30.11.1994 | ||
CH | 30.11.1994 | ||
NL | 01.06.1995 | ||
DE | 01.08.1996 | ||
Former [1996/04] | AT | 12.11.1994 | |
GB | 12.11.1994 | ||
SE | 13.11.1994 | ||
BE | 30.11.1994 | ||
CH | 30.11.1994 | ||
NL | 01.06.1995 | ||
Former [1996/03] | AT | 12.11.1994 | |
GB | 12.11.1994 | ||
SE | 13.11.1994 | ||
CH | 30.11.1994 | ||
NL | 01.06.1995 | ||
Former [1995/52] | AT | 12.11.1994 | |
GB | 12.11.1994 | ||
CH | 30.11.1994 | ||
NL | 01.06.1995 | ||
Former [1995/44] | AT | 12.11.1994 | |
GB | 12.11.1994 | ||
CH | 30.11.1994 | ||
Former [1995/40] | AT | 12.11.1994 | |
CH | 30.11.1994 | ||
Former [1995/36] | CH | 30.11.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | GB893311 [ ] (PROTECTIVE PACKAGING DEVELOPME); | FR1519714 [ ] (POLYMER PROCESSING RES INST); | US3589975 [ ] (ANDREWS WILLIAM PAGE, et al) | Examination | US3086651 | US3815947 |