EP0029072 - Mixer for continuously mixing material, especially synthetic material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1981/21] | Method and mixer for continuously mixing material, especially synthetic material | ||
[1983/49] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.1984 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.12.1984 [1984/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MTI-Mischtechnik Industrieanlagen GmbH Detmolder Strasse 210 D-4937 Lage / DE | [1981/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Honemeyer, Rolf Wellbrockerweg 16 D-4900 Herford / DE | 02 /
Müller, Wolfgang Wewelerstrasse 6 D-4920 Lemgo / DE | [1981/21] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/21] | TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 D-33617 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 79104551.1 | 16.11.1979 | [1981/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0029072 | Date: | 27.05.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0029072 | Date: | 07.12.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.1980 | Classification | IPC: | B29B1/06, B01F7/16 | [1981/21] | CPC: |
B29B13/021 (EP);
B01F27/80 (EP);
B29B7/44 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1981/21] | Title | German: | Mischer zum kontinuierlichen Mischen von Stoffen, insbesondere Kunststoffen | [1983/49] | English: | Mixer for continuously mixing material, especially synthetic material | [1983/49] | French: | Mélangeur pour mélanger en continu des matériaux, notamment des matières synthétiques | [1983/49] |
Former [1981/21] | Verfahren und Mischer zum kontinuierlichen Mischen von Stoffen, insbesondere Kunststoffen | ||
Former [1981/21] | Method and mixer for continuously mixing material, especially synthetic material | ||
Former [1981/21] | Procédé et mélangeur pour mélanger en continu des matériaux, notamment des matières synthétiques | Examination procedure | 19.08.1980 | Examination requested [1981/21] | 29.01.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 09.05.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.09.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.11.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB518854 [ ] (JAMES PETTIGREW OGILVIE, et al); | DE1258836 [ ] (WIBAU GMBH); | DE1517647 [ ] (DIDIER WERKE AG); | US3554274 [ ] (HERFELD FRIEDRICH W); | DE2202185 [ ] (WEY GINO DIPL ING); | FR2269864 [ ] (IWAKO HIROYUKI [JP]); | FR2326968 [ ] (JAPAN SYNTHETIC RUBBER CO LTD [JP]) |