EP0013323 - Process for welding cast iron [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MESSER GRIESHEIM GMBH Hanauer Landstrasse 330 60314 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/15] | For all designated states MESSER GRIESHEIM GMBH Hanauer Landstrasse 330 D-60314 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hennemann, Klaus Schlesierweg 8 D-6238 Hofheim/Ts. / DE | 02 /
Mondre, Josef Assenheimerstrasse 25 D-6367 Karben 1 / DE | [1980/15] | Application number, filing date | 79104685.7 | 24.11.1979 | [1980/15] | Priority number, date | DE19792901338 | 15.01.1979 Original published format: DE 2901338 | [1980/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0013323 | Date: | 23.07.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0013323 | Date: | 10.03.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.1980 | Classification | IPC: | B23K28/00, B23K31/02, B23K35/30 | [1980/15] | CPC: |
B23K9/23 (EP);
B23K35/004 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, FR, GB, IT [1980/15] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Schweissen von Gusseisen | [1980/15] | English: | Process for welding cast iron | [1980/15] | French: | Procédé pour souder de la fonte | [1980/15] | Examination procedure | 22.08.1980 | Examination requested [1980/23] | 21.05.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 18.08.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.12.1982 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.11.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2437247 [ ]; | DE1188911 [ ] (BOEHLER & CO AG GEB); | CH514392 [ ] (AVESTA JERNVERKS AB [SE]); | DE1752401 [ ] (LE METALLITSCHESKIJ SAWOD IM X); | CH531909 [ ] (BOEHLER & CO AG GEB [AT]) |