EP0012399 - Process for applying metallic coatings to metallic workpieces by a mechano-chemical treatment of said pieces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 02.08.1986 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2008 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tolkmit, Bernd Amselfeld 4 D-5983 Balve 2 (Garbeck) / DE | [1980/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1980/13] | Representative(s) | Stark, Walter Moerser Strasse 140 47803 Krefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/13] | Stark, Walter, Dr.-Ing. Moerser Strasse 140 D-47803 Krefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 79105012.3 | 08.12.1979 | [1980/13] | Priority number, date | DE19782854159 | 15.12.1978 Original published format: DE 2854159 | DE19792919726 | 16.05.1979 Original published format: DE 2919726 | [1980/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0012399 | Date: | 25.06.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0012399 | Date: | 17.11.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/46] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0012399 | Date: | 17.09.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.1980 | Classification | IPC: | C23C24/00 | [1986/15] | CPC: |
C23C24/045 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1980/13] | C23C17/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1980/13] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Aufbringen metallischer Überzüge auf metallische Werkstücke durch mechanisch-chemisches Behandeln der Werkstücke | [1980/13] | English: | Process for applying metallic coatings to metallic workpieces by a mechano-chemical treatment of said pieces | [1980/13] | French: | Procédé d'application de couches métalliques sur des objets métalliques par un traitement mécano-chimique desdits objets | [1980/13] | Examination procedure | 17.05.1980 | Examination requested [1980/17] | 06.02.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.07.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 25.05.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | Appeal received | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.08.1983
MacDermid Incorporated 245 Freight Street Waterbury, CT 06720 / US Opponent's representative Ruschke, Hans Edvard Ruschke Madgwick Seide & Kollegen Patentanwälte Patent Attorney (UK) PartG mbB Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.08.1983
MacDermid Incorporated 245 Freight Street Waterbury, CT 06720 / US Opponent's representative Ruschke, Hans Edvard RUSCHKE HARTMANN MADGWICK & SEIDE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [1983/43] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.08.1983
MacDermid Incorporated 245 Freight Street Waterbury, CT 06720 / US Opponent's representative Ruschke, Hans Edvard Patentanwälte Dipl. Ing. Olaf Ruschke Dipl. Ing. Hans E. Ruschke Dipl.-Ing. Jürgen Rost Dipl.-Chem Dr. U. Rotter Pienzenauerstrasse 2 D-8000 München 80 / DE | 11.10.1983 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 10.12.1983 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 03.02.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 13.04.1984 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 20.02.1986 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 07.04.1986 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 19.09.1984 | Appeal received No. T0221/84 | 24.05.1985 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1985/21] | 16.07.1985 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1985/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.12.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.12.1982 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | DE1771816 [ ] (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG); | US4062990 [ ] (COCH LESTER); | US3268356 [ ] (SIMON JOHN G) |