EP0012916 - Wrapping and cutting device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.1985 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.07.1985 [1985/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/21] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | ||
Former [1980/14] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Paul-Gossen-Strasse 100 D-91052 Erlangen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kaiser, Jürgen Schäffnerstrasse 12 D-8400 Regensburg / DE | [1980/14] | Application number, filing date | 79105072.7 | 10.12.1979 | [1980/14] | Priority number, date | DE19782856739 | 29.12.1978 Original published format: DE 2856739 | [1980/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0012916 | Date: | 09.07.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0012916 | Date: | 11.07.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.1980 | Classification | IPC: | H01F41/10, H01R43/00 | [1980/14] | CPC: |
H01R43/033 (EP,US);
H01F41/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, FR, GB, IT, NL [1980/14] | Title | German: | Anwickel- und Schneidvorrichtung | [1980/14] | English: | Wrapping and cutting device | [1980/14] | French: | Dispositif d'enroulement et de découpage | [1980/14] | Examination procedure | 11.12.1980 | Examination requested [1981/08] | 28.06.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.08.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.10.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 27.12.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.04.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3244202 [ ] (HUANG SYDNEY S); | US3619829 [ ] (FINN FREDERICK GEORGE, et al); | US3701367 [ ] (ACKERMAN DANIEL WHITNEY); | DE2153705 [ ] (SCHUEMANN FA HEINRICH) |