EP0013387 - Agglomerated particles prepared from highly dispersed metal oxides and opacifiers, method for their preparation and their use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1980/15] | Agglomerated mixtures prepared from highly dispersed metal oxides and opacifiers, method for their preparation and their use | ||
[1982/12] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Consortium für elektrochemische Industrie GmbH Zielstattstrasse 20 D-8000 München 70 / DE | [1980/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kratel, Günter, Dr., Dipl.-Chem. Alpenblickstrasse 10 D-8961 Durach-Bechen / DE | 02 /
Katzer, Hans, Dr., Dipl.-Chem. Sollner Strasse 10 D-8000 München 71 / DE | 03 /
Loskot, Stephan, Dr., Dipl.-Chem. Ludwigstrasse 37 D-8960 Kempten / DE | 04 /
Lang, Wilfried Säntisstrasse 2 D-8961 Sulzberg / DE | 05 /
Weis, Klaus Ledererstrasse 7 D-8000 München 2 / DE | [1980/15] | Application number, filing date | 79105249.1 | 18.12.1979 | [1980/15] | Priority number, date | DE19782854984 | 20.12.1978 Original published format: DE 2854984 | [1980/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0013387 | Date: | 23.07.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0013387 | Date: | 24.03.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.1980 | Classification | IPC: | C04B43/00, C04B31/40 | [1980/15] | CPC: |
F16L59/028 (EP,US);
C04B30/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C04B30/00, C04B14/06, C04B14/30 (EP,US);
C04B30/00, C04B14/06, C04B14/32 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1980/15] | Title | German: | Agglomerierte Teilchen aus hochdispersen Metalloxiden und Trübungsstoffen, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Verwendung | [1982/12] | English: | Agglomerated particles prepared from highly dispersed metal oxides and opacifiers, method for their preparation and their use | [1982/12] | French: | Particules agglomérées d'oxydes métalliques finement dispersés et d'opacifiants, procédé pour leur préparation et leur utilisation | [1982/12] |
Former [1980/15] | Agglomerierte Mischungen aus hochdispersen Metalloxiden und Trübungsstoffen, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Verwendung | ||
Former [1980/15] | Agglomerated mixtures prepared from highly dispersed metal oxides and opacifiers, method for their preparation and their use | ||
Former [1980/15] | Mélanges agglomérés d'oxydes métalliques finement dispersés et d'opacifiants, procédé pour leur préparation et leur utilisation | Examination procedure | 03.07.1980 | Examination requested [1980/19] | 21.04.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.05.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 04.08.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.12.1982 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3055831 [ ] (IRVIN BARNETT, et al); | DE1905673 [ ] (FERRO N V); | DE2036124 [ ]; | DE2806367 [ ] (MICROPORE INTERNATIONAL LTD); | DE2712625 [ ] (GRUENZWEIG HARTMANN GLASFASER); | EP0002487 [ ] (GRUENZWEIG HARTMANN GLASFASER [DE]) |