Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] |
31.10.1983 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.01.1984 [1984/01] |
07.07.1981 | Request for examination filed | published on 09.09.1981 [1981/36] |
24.02.1981 | Publication of search report | published on 29.04.1981 [1981/17] |
30.09.1980 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 26.11.1980 [1980/24] |