Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0019016 | Global Dossier | 29.04.1981 | A3 | EP0019016 | 26.11.1980 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE2855553 | 22.12.1978 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE2855553 | 05.01.1989 | C2 | DE2855553 | 31.07.1980 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE2855553 | 22.12.1978 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2472146 | 26.06.1981 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE2855553 | 22.12.1978 |