EP0013415 - Fabrication of nickel electrodes for alkaline batteries [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Western Electric Company, Incorporated 222 Broadway New York, NY 10038 / US | [1983/10] |
Former [1980/15] | For all designated states Western Electric Company, Incorporated 222 Broadway New York, N.Y. 10038 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
O'Sullivan, Thomas Denis 123 Summit Avenue Summit New Jersey 07901 / US | [1980/15] | Representative(s) | Blumbach Weser Bergen Kramer Zwirner Hoffmann Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/15] | Blumbach Weser Bergen Kramer Zwirner Hoffmann Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 D-81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 79105338.2 | 21.12.1979 | [1980/15] | Priority number, date | US19780973712 | 27.12.1978 Original published format: US 973712 | [1980/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0013415 | Date: | 23.07.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0013415 | Date: | 23.03.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.1980 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/29, H01M4/32 | [1980/15] | CPC: |
H01M4/29 (EP,US);
H01M4/32 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02P70/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1980/15] | Title | German: | Herstellung von Nickel-Elektroden für alkalische Batterien | [1980/15] | English: | Fabrication of nickel electrodes for alkaline batteries | [1980/15] | French: | Fabrication d'électrodes en nickel pour batteries alcalines | [1980/15] | File destroyed: | 05.09.1996 | Examination procedure | 03.10.1980 | Examination requested [1981/01] | 04.08.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 23.07.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.12.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP52124140 ; | [A]US3979223 (KROGER HANNS H, et al); | [A]FR2347134 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 88, No. 16, 17th April 1978, page 149, No. 107886n Columbus, Ohio, U.S.A. & JP-A-52 124140 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO.,LTD.) 18-10-1977 * Abstract *, & JP52124140 A 00000000 |