EP0014774 - Apparatus and method for the transmission of data (information) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.1981 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1980/18] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 NL-2596 HR Den Haag / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Verhaagen, Caspar Badhuisweg 3 NL-1031 CM Amsterdam / NL | 02 /
Spaargaren, Klaas Badhuisweg 3 NL-1031 CM Amsterdam / NL | 03 /
Schoonbrood, Jan Joseph Louis Robert 29 rue De Berri Paris-8 / FR | [1980/18] | Representative(s) | Keuzenkamp, Abraham, et al c/o SHELL Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. P.O. Box 302 NL-2501 CH 's-Gravenhage / NL | [1980/18] | Application number, filing date | 79200070.5 | 09.02.1979 | [1980/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0014774 | Date: | 03.09.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.1979 | Classification | IPC: | H04M11/00 | [1980/18] | CPC: |
H04M11/002 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1980/18] | Title | German: | Apparat und Verfahren zur Daten(Informations)übertragung | [1980/18] | English: | Apparatus and method for the transmission of data (information) | [1980/18] | French: | Appareil et méthode pour la transmission de données (information) | [1980/18] | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 06.02.1981 | Examination requested [1981/16] | 26.08.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.12.1981 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1982/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3553376 [ ]; | US3962545 [ ]; | US3820074 [ ]; | US3072894 [ ] (CHAPIN DARYL M); | US4059727 [ ]; | US3989898 [ ]; | FR1433793 [ ] |