EP0004408 - A process for preparing 1,7-octadiene and for activating a catalyst suitable for use in the process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nozaki, Kenzie 1407 Lakecliff Houston Texas 77077 / US | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Puister, Antonius Tonnis, et al P.O. Box 302 2501 CH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1982/08] | Puister, Antonius Tonnis, Mr., et al P.O. Box 302 NL-2501 CH The Hague / NL | ||
Former [1981/45] | Keuzenkamp, Abraham c/o SHELL Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. P.O. Box 302 NL-2501 CH 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 79200140.6 | 22.03.1979 | Priority number, date | US19780890114 | 27.03.1978 Original published format: US 890114 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0004408 | Date: | Status: | (deleted) | [N/P] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0004408 | Date: | 03.10.1979 | Language: | EN | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0004408 | Date: | 11.11.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.1979 | Classification | IPC: | C07C2/40, C07C11/12, B01J31/24, B01J37/16, B01J37/18, B01J31/28 | [1981/45] | CPC: |
B01J31/0237 (EP);
B01J31/0239 (EP);
B01J31/0267 (EP);
B01J31/04 (EP);
B01J31/24 (EP);
B01J31/2404 (EP);
B01J37/16 (EP);
C07C2/74 (EP);
B01J2231/323 (EP);
B01J2531/824 (EP);
C07C2527/054 (EP);
C07C2527/25 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C07C2/74, C07C11/12 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1981/45] | C07C11/12, C07C3/00, B01J31/24, B01J37/16, B01J37/18, B01J31/28 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von 1,7-Octadien und zur Aktivierung eines für die Anwendung in diesem Verfahren geeigneten Katalysators | English: | A process for preparing 1,7-octadiene and for activating a catalyst suitable for use in the process | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de 1,7-octadiène et pour l'activation d'un catalyseur convenant à l'emploi dans ce procédé | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 19.03.1980 | Examination requested [1980/12] | 16.09.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.10.1980 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 19.05.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.08.1982 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3823199 ; | [AD]US3732328 ; | [AD]GB1341324 | [AD] - JOURNAL OF ORGANOMETALLIC CHEMISTRY, Volume 55, July 16 1973, Lausanne (CH) P. ROFFIA et al.: "Catalysis by Palladium Salts IV. Selective Hydrogenation with Formic acid in the Palladium Catalysed Dimerisation of 1, 3-butadiene; Syntheses of 1, 7-octadiene"pages 405-407. |