Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | |
10.12.1982 | (Expected) grant | published on 09.02.1983 [1983/06] |
07.05.1980 | Request for examination filed | published on 09.07.1980 [1980/14] |
04.09.1979 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |