Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0004993 | Global Dossier | 09.02.1983 | B1 | EP0004993 | 31.10.1979 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB1524178 | 18.04.1978 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE2964692D1 | 17.03.1983 | D1 | Priority number | Date | GB1524178 | 18.04.1978 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS54140528 | 31.10.1979 | A | Priority number | Date | GB1524178 | 18.04.1978 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4244645 | 13.01.1981 | A | Priority number | Date | GB1524178 | 18.04.1978 |