EP0007668 - The manufacture of a group of infra-red detector elements, and a group so manufactured [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 24.02.1987 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.1987 | Opposition rejected | published on 15.04.1987 [1987/16] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
PHILIPS ELECTRONIC AND ASSOCIATED INDUSTRIES LIMITED Philips House 188 Tottenham Court Road London W1P 9LE / GB | For:DE
FR
IT
SE
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1980/14] | For:GB
PHILIPS ELECTRONIC AND ASSOCIATED INDUSTRIES LIMITED Philips House 188 Tottenham Court Road London W1P 9LE / GB | ||
For:DE
FR
IT
SE
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [1980/03] | For:GB
PHILIPS ELECTRONIC AND ASSOCIATED INDUSTRIES LIMITED Philips House 188 Tottenham Court Road London W1P 9LE / GB | ||
For:DE
FR
IT
SE
N.V. Philips' Gloeilampenfabrieken Emmasingel 29 NL-5611 AZ Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baker, Ian Martin c/o Philips Electronic and Ass. Industries Ltd, Patent Dept. Mullard House Torrington Place London, WC1E 7HD / GB | 02 /
Withers, Richard Breton c/o Philips Electronic and Ass. Industries Ltd, Patent Dept. Mullard House Torrington Place London, WC1E 7HD / GB | [1980/03] | Representative(s) | Boxall, Robin John Philips Electronics UK Limited Patents and Trade Marks Department Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/42] | Boxall, Robin John Philips Electronics UK Limited Patents and Trade Marks Department Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | ||
Former [1980/03] | Boxall, Robin John Philips Electronic and Associated Ind. Ltd. Patent Department Mullard House Torrington Place London WC1E 7HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 79200397.2 | 17.07.1979 | [1980/03] | Priority number, date | GB19310075178 | 31.07.1978 Original published format: GB 3175178 | [1980/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0007668 | Date: | 06.02.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0007668 | Date: | 17.10.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.1979 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/14, H01L31/02, H01L31/18 | [1980/03] | CPC: |
H01L27/14632 (EP,US);
H01L21/465 (EP,US);
H01L21/467 (EP,US);
H01L25/042 (EP,US);
H01L27/14603 (EP,US);
H01L27/14669 (EP,US);
H01L27/14687 (EP,US);
H01L27/14696 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1980/03] | Title | German: | Herstellung einer Gruppe von Infrarot-Detektorelementen und so hergestellte Gruppe | [1980/03] | English: | The manufacture of a group of infra-red detector elements, and a group so manufactured | [1980/03] | French: | Fabrication d'un groupe d'éléments détecteurs infra-rouge et groupe ainsi fabriqué | [1980/03] | Examination procedure | 31.03.1980 | Examination requested [1980/13] | 09.04.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.08.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.01.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
11.02.1985
10.03.1985
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/16] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.02.1985
10.03.1985
ADMISSIBLE Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 D-80506 München / DE | 20.08.1985 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 01.02.1986 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 04.03.1986 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 11.08.1986 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 13.11.1986 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 23.11.1986 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1987/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.07.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR1567408 [ ]; | US4037311 [ ] (BLACKMAN MORRIS V, et al); | US4025793 [ ] (SHAW JOHN B, et al); | US4062107 [ ] (BLACKMAN MAURICE V, et al); | US3676317 [ ] (HARKINS PATRICK A JR); | GB1188797 [ ] (PHILIPS ELECTRONIC ASSOCIATED [GB]) |