EP0008822 - Device for securing a wheel rim to a tyre changing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states du Quesne, Francis Kleistraat 138 B-2630 Aartselaar / BE | [1980/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1980/06] | Representative(s) | Ottelohe, Jozef René Bureau Ottelohe J.R. Postbus 3 Fruithoflaan 105 2600 Antwerpen (Berchem) / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/06] | Ottelohe, Jozef René Bureau Ottelohe J.R. Postbus 3 Fruithoflaan 105 B-2600 Antwerpen (Berchem) / BE | Application number, filing date | 79200437.6 | 09.08.1979 | [1980/06] | Priority number, date | BE19782057248 | 01.09.1978 Original published format: BE 2057248 | [1980/06] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0008822 | Date: | 19.03.1980 | Language: | FR | [1980/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0008822 | Date: | 07.04.1982 | Language: | FR | [1982/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.12.1979 | Classification | IPC: | B60C25/06 | [1980/06] | CPC: |
B60B30/06 (EP,US);
B60C25/0539 (EP,US);
B60C25/0545 (EP,US);
B60B2900/112 (EP,US);
B60Y2200/11 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1980/06] | Title | German: | Feststellvorrichtung für ein Fahrzeugrad auf einer Reifenwechselvorrichtung | [1980/06] | English: | Device for securing a wheel rim to a tyre changing apparatus | [1980/06] | French: | Dispositif pour fixer une roue sur un appareil à monter et à démonter les pneus | [1980/06] | Examination procedure | 31.07.1980 | Examination requested [1980/23] | 09.04.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.09.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.01.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 07.04.1982 | [1982/31] | Documents cited: | Search | FR711944 [ ]; | FR2347217 [ ] (HESSELS ELEUTHEER [BE]); | GB549932 [ ] (HARRY MERRETT) |