EP0010817 - Apparatus for the exchange of heat by means of channels having a small diameter, and the use of this apparatus in different heating systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Akzo N.V. Velperweg 76 NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1980/14] | For all designated states AKZO N.V. Velperweg 76 NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL | ||
Former [1980/10] | For all designated states Akzo N.V. Velperweg 76 NL-6826 BM Arnhem / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vleggaar, Jan, Dr. Lorentzlaan 36 NL-7002 HB Doetinchem / NL | 02 /
Korstanje, Hugo Peter, Ir. Jachtlaan 8 NL-6891 CK Rozendaal / NL | [1981/01] |
Former [1980/10] | 01 /
Vleggaar, Jan, Dr. Lorentzlaan 36 NL-7002 HB Dpetinchem / NL | ||
02 /
Korstanje, Hugo Peter, Ir. Jachtlaan 8 NL-6891 CK Rozendaal / NL | Representative(s) | Sieders, René, et al AKZO NOBEL N.V. Patent Department (Dept. CO) P.O. Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1980/10] | Sieders, René, et al AKZO NOBEL N.V. Patent Department (Dept. CO) P.O. Box 9300 NL-6800 SB Arnhem / NL | Application number, filing date | 79200637.1 | 02.11.1979 | [1980/10] | Priority number, date | NL19780011005 | 06.11.1978 Original published format: NL 7811005 | NL19780011006 | 06.11.1978 Original published format: NL 7811006 | [1980/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0010817 | Date: | 14.05.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0010817 | Date: | 16.03.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.1980 | Classification | IPC: | F28F21/06, F24J3/02 | [1983/11] | CPC: |
B60H1/00321 (EP);
B60H1/00342 (EP);
B60H1/039 (EP);
F28D7/0025 (EP);
F28F1/022 (EP);
F28F21/06 (EP);
F28F2275/02 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1980/10] | F28F21/06, F28F1/04, // F24J3/02, F28D1/04, F28D7/00, B60H1/02 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1980/10] | Title | German: | Aus Kanälen mit kleinem Durchmesser gebildetes Wärmeaustauschgerät und seine Verwendung in verschiedenen Heizungssystemen | [1980/10] | English: | Apparatus for the exchange of heat by means of channels having a small diameter, and the use of this apparatus in different heating systems | [1980/10] | French: | Appareil échangeur de chaleur constitué par des canalisations à petit diamètre, et son utilisation dans différents systèmes de chauffage | [1980/10] | Examination procedure | 20.11.1979 | Examination requested [1980/10] | 21.01.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 08.07.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.12.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2414663 [ ] (RENNEBECK KLAUS); | FR2339820 [ ] (JENAER GLASWERK SCHOTT & GEN [DE]); | US3537935 [ ] (WITHERS MICHAEL SOMERVILLE); | DE1601185 [ ] (DIETZSCH GMBH HANS JOACHIM); | US3435893 [ ] (WITHERS MICHAEL S); | US3616022 [ ] (WITHERS MICHAEL SOMERVILLE) |