EP0029468 - Back-wash filter assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 29.06.1985 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.1985 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 28.08.1985 [1985/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gebrüder Sulzer Aktiengesellschaft Zürcherstrasse 9 CH-8401 Winterthur / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1981/22] | For all designated states GEBRÜDER SULZER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Zürcherstrasse 9 CH-8401 Winterthur / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Müller, Otto Hofwiesenstrasse 29 CH-8057 Zürich / CH | [1981/22] | Representative(s) | Sparing, Nikolaus, et al Rethelstrasse 123 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/22] | Sparing, Nikolaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Rethelstrasse 123 D-40237 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 79200694.2 | 27.11.1979 | [1981/22] | Priority number, date | CH19790009900 | 05.11.1979 Original published format: CH 990079 | [1981/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0029468 | Date: | 03.06.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0029468 | Date: | 20.10.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/42] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0029468 | Date: | 28.08.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.1981 | Classification | IPC: | B01D23/20, B01D23/16, B01D23/24, C02F1/00 | [1981/22] | CPC: |
B01D24/22 (EP,US);
B01D24/44 (EP,US);
B01D24/4631 (EP,US);
B01D2201/48 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT [1981/28] |
Former [1981/22] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Rückspülbare Filteranlage | [1981/22] | English: | Back-wash filter assembly | [1981/22] | French: | Dispositif de filtration à nettoyage par contre-courant | [1981/22] | Examination procedure | 27.11.1979 | Examination requested [1981/22] | 03.02.1981 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CH, LU, NL, SE | 14.04.1981 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 05.04.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 22.04.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.07.1983
17.02.1984
ADMISSIBLE WABAG Wasserreinigungsbau Alfred Kretzschmar GmbH & Co. KG Lichtenfelser Strasse 53 D-8650 Kulmbach / DE Opponent's representative Planker, Karl-Josef Patentanwältin Dr. Beate Frese-Göddeke Hüttenallee 237b 47800 Krefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/39] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.07.1983
17.02.1984
ADMISSIBLE WABAG Wasserreinigungsbau Alfred Kretzschmar GmbH & Co. KG Lichtenfelser Strasse 53 D-8650 Kulmbach / DE Opponent's representative Planker, Karl-Josef, Dipl.-Phys. Babcock-BSH AG vormals Büttner-Schilde-Haas AG, Postfach 6 D-47811 Krefeld / DE | 17.02.1984 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 05.06.1984 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 19.06.1984 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.1984 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 08.02.1985 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 29.03.1985 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB552302 [ ] (PATERSON ENGINEERING COMPANY L, et al); | FR2429033 [ ] (USINOR [FR]) |