EP0030986 - Abrasive-containing, built liquid detergent composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.05.1983 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY 301 East Sixth Street Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/26] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY 301 East Sixth Street Cincinnati Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mitchell, Sharon Janosik 7951 Hunters Ridge Dr. West Chester, OH 45069 / US | 02 /
Spinner, Jonathan 8428 Arundel Ct. Cincinnati, OH 45231 / US | [1981/26] | Representative(s) | Ernst, Hubert, et al PROCTER & GAMBLE EUROPEAN TECHNICAL CENTER Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/26] | Ernst, Hubert, et al PROCTER & GAMBLE EUROPEAN TECHNICAL CENTER Temselaan 100 B-1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | Application number, filing date | 79200802.1 | 24.12.1979 | [1981/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0030986 | Date: | 01.07.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.1980 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/14, C11D1/86, C11D3/08 | [1981/26] | CPC: |
C11D3/0094 (EP);
C11D17/0013 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1981/26] | Title | German: | Scheuermittel und Komplexbildner enthaltende flüssige Reinigungsmittelzusammensetzung | [1981/26] | English: | Abrasive-containing, built liquid detergent composition | [1981/26] | French: | Composition détergente liquide contenant un adjuvant et un abrasif | [1981/26] | File destroyed: | 06.06.1989 | Examination procedure | 22.12.1981 | Examination requested [1982/09] | 28.10.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.05.1983 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1983/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.09.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3813349 [ ]; | GB1534680 [ ]; | GB1481685 [ ]; | DE2516003 [ ]; | US3623990 [ ] |