EP0003389 - Process for coating underwater surfaces with wax and coating compositions thus applied [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 09.07.1984 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.1984 | Revocation of patent | published on 12.09.1984 [1984/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The British Petroleum Company p.l.c. Britannic House Moor Lane London EC2Y 9BU / GB | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Crump, Ronald Alfred Brit. Petrol. Co. Ltd. Britannic House Moor Lane London EC2Y 9BU / GB | 02 /
Goldie, Brian Peter Forsyth BP Trading Limited Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Eastman, Hugh Leonard, et al c/o The British Petroleum Company plc Patents Division Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/50] | Eastman, Hugh Leonard, et al c/o The British Petroleum Company plc Patents Division Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB | Application number, filing date | 79300009.2 | 04.01.1979 | Priority number, date | GB19780002132 | 19.01.1978 Original published format: GB 213278 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0003389 | Date: | 08.08.1979 | Language: | EN | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0003389 | Date: | 15.12.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.1979 | Classification | IPC: | C09D5/16, B05D5/00, C08L91/06 | [1982/50] | CPC: |
C09D5/1656 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Beschichtung von Unterwasser-Oberflächen mit Wachs und so angebrachte Ueberzugsmittel | English: | Process for coating underwater surfaces with wax and coating compositions thus applied | French: | Procédé de revêtement de surfaces sous-marines avec de la cire et compositions de revêtement ainsi appliquées | Examination procedure | 21.01.1980 | Examination requested [1980/08] | 10.12.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 25.06.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
14.09.1983
28.09.1983
ADMISSIBLE Röhm GmbH Kirschenallee 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/47] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
14.09.1983
28.09.1983
ADMISSIBLE Röhm GmbH Kirschenallee D-64293 Darmstadt / DE | 05.10.1983 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 10.02.1984 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 20.03.1984 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 31.03.1984 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1984/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2264069 [ ] |