EP0003391 - Apparatus for bending and tempering glass [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.1984 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.06.1984 [1984/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states McMaster, Harold A. 420 Water Street Woodville Ohio / US | For all designated states Nitschke, Norman Carl 9102 Buck Road Perrysburg Ohio 43551 / US | For all designated states Nitschke, John Stephen 324 East Second Perrysburg Ohio 43551 / US | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Wisher, Michael Frederick, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 91 Wimpole Street London W1M 8AH / GB | [1981/26] | Application number, filing date | 79300012.6 | 04.01.1979 | Priority number, date | US19780872201 | 25.01.1978 Original published format: US 872201 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0003391 | Date: | 08.08.1979 | Language: | EN | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0003391 | Date: | 25.05.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.1979 | Classification | IPC: | C03B23/025 | [1983/21] | CPC: |
C03B23/0357 (EP);
C03B23/02 (EP);
C03B23/0252 (EP);
C03B23/03 (EP);
C03B27/0417 (EP);
C03B27/048 (EP);
C03B29/08 (EP);
C03B35/145 (EP);
C03B35/164 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1983/21] | C03B23/02 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Biegen und zur Wärmebehandlung von Glas | English: | Apparatus for bending and tempering glass | French: | Appareil pour le cintrage et la trempe du verre | Examination procedure | 30.07.1979 | Examination requested | 16.01.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: {0}) | 05.03.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.02.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 27.10.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.02.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.01.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.01.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3455672 [ ] (DOMPKOWSKI ALEX G); | US3607187 [ ] (MCMASTER HAROLD A); | US3684473 [ ] (RITTER GEORGE F JR); | US3778244 [ ] (NEDELEC M, et al); | DE2461974 [ ] (LIBBEY OWENS FORD CO) |