EP0003667 - Ergoline compounds, their preparation and pharmaceutical compositions containing them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1982/28] | Ergoline compounds, their preparation, compositions containing them and their use as pharmaceuticals | ||
[1982/28] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY 307 East McCarty Street Indianapolis IN 46285 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/28] | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY 307, East McCarty Street Indianapolis Indiana 46285 / US | ||
Former [1982/28] | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY 307, East McCarty Street Indianapolis Indiana 46285 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kornfeld, Edmund Carl 5159 E 76th. Court Indianapolis Indiana 46250 / US | 02 /
Bach, Nicholas James 4269, Burkhart, East Drive Indianapolis Indiana 46227 / US | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Crowther, Terence Roger, et al Erl Wood Manor Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/28] | Crowther, Terence Roger European Patent Attorney, et al Erl Wood Manor Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | ||
Former [1982/28] | McVey, Kenneth William Henry "Littlefield" Cavendish Road St. Georges Hill Weybridge, Surrey KT13 OJP / GB | Application number, filing date | 79300177.7 | 05.02.1979 | Priority number, date | US19780875978 | 08.02.1978 Original published format: US 875978 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0003667 | Date: | 22.08.1979 | Language: | EN | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0003667 | Date: | 14.07.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.1979 | Classification | IPC: | C07D457/02, A61K31/48 | [1982/28] | CPC: |
C07D457/04 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/00 (EP);
C07D457/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, NL, SE | Title | German: | Ergolinderivate, ihre Herstellung und sie enthaltende Arzneimittel | [1982/28] | English: | Ergoline compounds, their preparation and pharmaceutical compositions containing them | [1982/28] | French: | Dérivés de l'ergoline, leur préparation et compositions pharmaceutiques les contenant | [1982/28] |
Former [1982/28] | Ergolin-Derivate, ihre Herstellung, diese enthaltende Zusammensetzungen und ihre pharmazeutische Verwendung | ||
Former [1982/28] | Ergoline compounds, their preparation, compositions containing them and their use as pharmaceuticals | ||
Former [1982/28] | Dérivés de l'ergoline, leur préparation, compositions les contenant et leur application comme médicaments | Examination procedure | 16.01.1980 | Examination requested [1980/07] | 20.10.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 14.12.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.04.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2335750 [ ] (LILLY CO ELI); | US3901894 [ ] (KORNFELD EDMUND C, et al); | DE2509471 [ ] (SANDOZ AG); | US3920664 [ ] (CLEMENS JAMES A, et al); | US3959288 [ ] (BACH NICHOLAS J, et al); | US3985752 [ ] (KORNFELD EDMUND C, et al); | US4054660 [ ] (CLEMENS JAMES A, et al) |