EP0004729 - Apparatus and method for recording high-speed repetitive optical phenomena [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bradley, Daniel Joseph 51 Wellington Road Dublin 4 / IE | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Thomson, Roger Bruce, et al W.P. THOMPSON & CO. 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/08] | Thomson, Roger Bruce, et al W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Celcon House 289-293 High Holborn London WC1V 7HU / GB | ||
Former [1983/08] | Thomson, Roger Bruce POLLAK MERCER & TENCH High Holborn House 52-54 High Holborn London WC1V 6RY / GB | Application number, filing date | 79300451.6 | 21.03.1979 | Priority number, date | GB19780011546 | 23.03.1978 Original published format: GB 1154678 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0004729 | Date: | Status: | (deleted) | [N/P] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0004729 | Date: | 17.10.1979 | Language: | EN | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0004729 | Date: | 23.02.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.1979 | Classification | IPC: | G04F13/02, G03B39/00 | [1983/08] | CPC: |
G04F13/026 (EP,US);
G03B39/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Aufzeichnung sehr schneller sich wiederholender optischer Vorgänge | English: | Apparatus and method for recording high-speed repetitive optical phenomena | French: | Dispositif et procédé pour l'enregistrement de phénomènes optiques répétitifs ultra-rapides | Examination procedure | 09.04.1980 | Examination requested [1980/14] | 08.10.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: {0}) | 23.03.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 30.07.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.11.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 23.02.1983 | NL | 23.02.1983 | SE | 23.02.1983 | [1983/43] |
Former [1983/29] | CH | 23.02.1983 | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - REVIEW OF SCIENTIFIC INSTRUMENTS, vol. 47, nr. 8, August 1976, New York, USA, A.C. WALKER et al.: "Picosecond resolution real-time, linear detection system for 10-mum radiation", pages 915-920. * Page 919, paragraph VI; figures 1, 4 * | [A] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INSTRUMENTATION AND MEASUREMENT, vol. IM-25, nr. 4, December 1976, New York, USA, T. HONDA et al.: "Measurements of picosecond laser pulses from mode-locked ND; YAG laser", pages 397-400. * Page 397; figure 1 * | [A] - OPTO ELECTRONICS, vol. 6, nr. 1 January 1974, London, GB, D.J. BRADLEY; "Generation and measurement of frequency-tunable picosecond pulses from dye lasers", pages 25-42. * Pages 29-31; paragraph 3 * | [P] - OPTICS COMMUNICATIONS, vol. 26, nr. 2, August 1978, Amsterdam, NL, M.C. ADAMS et al.: "Linear picosecond electron-optical chronoscopy at a repetition rate of 140 MHz", pages 273-276. * Page 273, right-hand column; page 274; page 275, left-hand column; figures 1, 4 * |