EP0004468 - Solar energy converters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1982/37] | Solar energy converters and absorbers therefor | ||
[1982/37] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robertson, Alastair Glentramman Manor House Lezayre Nr. Ramsey Isle of Man / GB | For all designated states Gomer, John Charles David Glentramman Manor House Lezayre Nr. Ramsey Isle of Man / GB | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Robertson, Alastair Glentramman Manor House Lezayre, near Ramsey Isle of Man / GB | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Gillam, Francis Cyril SANDERSON & CO. European Patent Attorneys 34, East Stockwell Street Colchester Essex CO1 1ST / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1980/10] | Gillam, Francis Cyril SANDERSON & CO. European Patent Attorneys 34, East Stockwell Street Colchester Essex CO1 1ST / GB | ||
Former [1980/10] | Northover, Robert Frank SANDERSON & CO. 97 High Street Colchester, CO1 1TH Essex / GB | Application number, filing date | 79300473.0 | 23.03.1979 | Priority number, date | GB19780011581 | 23.03.1978 Original published format: GB 1158178 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0004468 | Date: | 03.10.1979 | Language: | EN | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0004468 | Date: | 15.09.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.1979 | Classification | IPC: | F24J3/02 | [1982/37] | CPC: |
F24S23/82 (EP);
F24S23/745 (EP);
F24S30/452 (EP);
F24S50/20 (EP);
F24S80/60 (EP);
F24S2030/115 (EP);
Y02E10/47 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Solarkonverter | [1982/37] | English: | Solar energy converters | [1982/37] | French: | Convertisseur d'énergie solaire | [1982/37] |
Former [1982/37] | Solarkonverter und Kollektor dafür | ||
Former [1982/37] | Solar energy converters and absorbers therefor | ||
Former [1982/37] | Convertisseur d'énergie solaire et son collecteur | Examination procedure | 02.04.1980 | Examination requested [1980/13] | 05.11.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 25.11.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.06.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.04.1981 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   13.04.1981 | 31.03.1982 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   09.09.1982 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.03.1983 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | FR2326668 [ ] (INMOBILIEN FINANCE TRADING EST [LI]); | US4033324 [ ] (ECKELS ROBERT E); | FR2300913 [ ] (ROCHE MICHEL [FR]); | US1661473 [ ] (GODDARD ROBERT H, et al); | DE394232 [ ] (IWAN POPOFF); | FR1243221 [ ]; | US4107521 [ ] (WINDERS GORDON ROBERT); | FR2127673 [ ] (TARCICI ADNAN) | [ ] - SOLAR ENERGY, Vol. 19, No. 6, 1977 CAVALLERI. "Proposal for the production and seasonal storage of hot water to heat a city", pages 677-683 * Page 679figure 3 * |