EP0004751 - Electrical discharge heating device and method of heating using such [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.09.1980 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Laporte Industries Limited 3 Bedford Square London WC1B 3RA / GB | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Robinson, Michael Pink Cottage Ulceby Road Wooton South Humberside / GB | [N/P] | Representative(s) | ffrench-Lynch, Cecil, et al Laporte plc Group Patent Department, P.O. Box 8 Laporte House Kingsway Luton Bedfordshire LU4 8EW / GB | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 79300520.8 | 29.03.1979 | Priority number, date | GB19780013861 | 08.04.1978 Original published format: GB 1386178 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0004751 | Date: | 17.10.1979 | Language: | EN | [N/P] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0004751 | Date: | Status: | (deleted) | [N/P] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.1979 | Classification | IPC: | H05B7/00, H05H1/26, H01J37/32 | CPC: |
H05H1/38 (EP);
H01J37/023 (EP);
H05B7/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB | Title | German: | Elektrische Entladungserwärmungsanlage und Erwärmungsverfahren welches dieselbe verwendet | English: | Electrical discharge heating device and method of heating using such | French: | Dispositif de chauffage électrique à décharge et procédé de chauffage utilisant un tel dispositif | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 06.06.1980 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1980/24] | 17.08.1980 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1980/24] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1531811 (PETERSON FREDOLF J); | [A]US2686824 (EVANS RICHARD E, et al); | DE1288708 [ ] (INST BADAN JADROWYCH); | [A]FR2073331 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]FR2362936 (TETRONICS RES & DEV CO LTD [GB], et al) |