EP0005028 - Bolt tensioning device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1982/01] | Device for use in tightening nuts | ||
[1982/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hydra-Tight Limited Bentley Road South Darlaston WS10 8LQ / GB | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heaton, Frederick 4 Wallace Close Norton Canes near Cannock Staffordshire / GB | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Crux, John Anthony, et al 20 St. Mary's Parsonage Manchester M3 2NL / GB | [1982/01] |
Former [1982/01] | Wetters, Basil David Peter 20 St. Mary's Parsonage Manchester M3 2NL / GB | Application number, filing date | 79300596.8 | 11.04.1979 | Priority number, date | GB19780015305 | 18.04.1978 Original published format: GB 1530578 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0005028 | Date: | 31.10.1979 | Language: | EN | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0005028 | Date: | 06.01.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.1979 | Classification | IPC: | F16B31/00, B25B29/02 | [1982/01] | CPC: |
E04G21/121 (EP,US);
B25B29/02 (EP,US);
F15B15/1447 (EP,US);
F16B31/043 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE | Title | German: | Bolzenspannvorrichtung | [1982/01] | English: | Bolt tensioning device | [1982/01] | French: | Dispositif pour la mise en précontrainte des boulons | [1982/01] |
Former [1982/01] | Vorrichtung zum Vorspannen von Schraubenmuttern | ||
Former [1982/01] | Device for use in tightening nuts | ||
Former [1982/01] | Dispositif pour la mise en précontrainte des écrous | Examination procedure | 23.01.1980 | Examination requested [1980/08] | 16.09.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 14.07.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.10.1982 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1981 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   20.07.1981 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US2458976 [ ] (CAMPBELL ROLLIN E); | US2571265 [ ] (EDVARD LEUFVEN AXEL GUSTAV); | DE961759 [ ] (FRITZ LEONHARDT DR ING); | GB836779 [ ] (ARTHUR LEMPRIERE LANCEY BAKER, et al); | GB991783 [ ] (P & O PILGRIM VALVE LTD); | US3301297 [ ] (THOMAS BURR WILLIAM); | US3338552 [ ] (GUNTER PERSICKE); | GB1128206 [ ] (CHRISTIANI & NIELSEN LTD, et al); | GB1161593 [ ] (CABLE COVERS LTD [GB]); | US3549275 [ ] (LASKEY NORMAN V); | DE2052788 [ ]; | FR2188722 [ ] (LOCKMANN HANS [DE]); | DE2455788 [ ] (SCHENK HORST) |