EP0008487 - Installation and method for the storage of thermal energy in a pond containing a saturated aqueous saline solution [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wirguin, Joseph Menachem 40 King George Street Jerusalem / IL | For all designated states Melamed, Avraham 31 Haoranim Street Kfar Shemaryahu / IL | [1980/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1980/05] | Representative(s) | Abrams, Michael John, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1980/05] | Abrams, Michael John, et al Haseltine Lake & Co. 28, Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 79300680.0 | 23.04.1979 | [1980/05] | Priority number, date | IL19970000545 | 30.04.1978 Original published format: IL 54597 | [1980/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0008487 | Date: | 05.03.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0008487 | Date: | 16.09.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.1979 | Classification | IPC: | F24J3/00 | [1980/05] | CPC: |
F28D20/0043 (EP,US);
F24S10/13 (EP,US);
F28D20/0039 (EP,US);
F28D2020/0069 (EP,US);
F28D2020/0082 (EP,US);
F28D2020/0086 (EP,US);
Y02E10/44 (EP,US);
Y02E20/14 (EP,US);
Y02E60/14 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1980/05] | Title | German: | Einrichtung und Verfahren zur Speicherung thermischer Energie in einem Teich, der eine gesättigte wässerige Salzlösung enthält | [1980/05] | English: | Installation and method for the storage of thermal energy in a pond containing a saturated aqueous saline solution | [1980/05] | French: | Installation et procédé pour l'accumulation d'énergie thermique dans un étang contenant une solution saline aqueuse en état saturé | [1980/05] | Examination procedure | 25.04.1980 | Examination requested [1980/15] | 10.12.1980 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 31.03.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.07.1982 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3972183 [ ] (CHUBB TALBOT A); | US3997001 [ ] (CHUBB TALBOT A); | DE2631320 [ ] (ALEFELD GEORG); | DE2732320 [ ] (GEN ELECTRIC); | DE2819946 [ ] (JACKSON PETER) |