EP0005365 - Pyrano and thiopyrano (3,4-b) indole derivatives, processes for their preparation and pharmaceutical compositions containing them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1982/01] | Pyrano and thiopyrano (3,4-b) indole derivatives, processes and intermediates for their preparation, pharmaceutical compositions containing them and their use | ||
[1982/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states American Home Products Corporation Five Giralda Farms Madison, New Jersey 07940-0874 / US | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Asselin, Andre Alfred 1805 Muir Street St.Laurent Quebec / CA | 02 /
Humber, Leslie George 75 Maple Circle Dollard Des Ormeaux Quebec / CA | 03 /
Dionne, Gervais 1735 Boul O'Brien St.Laurent Quebec / CA | 04 /
Revesz, Clara 4474 Circle Road Montreal Quebec / CA | 05 /
Failli, Amedeo Arturo 2440 rue Robichaud St.Laurent Quebec / CA | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Porter, Graham Ronald, et al C/O John Wyeth & Brother Limited Huntercombe Lane South Taplow Maidenhead Berkshire, SL6 0PH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/01] | Porter, Graham Ronald, et al C/O John Wyeth & Brother Limited Huntercombe Lane South Taplow Maidenhead Berkshire, SL6 0PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 79300759.2 | 02.05.1979 | Priority number, date | US19780904081 | 08.05.1978 Original published format: US 904081 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0005365 | Date: | 14.11.1979 | Language: | EN | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0005365 | Date: | 06.01.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.1979 | Classification | IPC: | C07D491/04, C07D495/04, A61K31/405, // (C07D491/04, 311:00, 209:00),(C07D495/04, 335:00, 209:00) | [1982/01] | CPC: |
C07D491/04 (EP,US);
C07D495/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1982/01] |
Former [N/P] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Pyrano- bzw. Thiopyrano(3,4-b)indolderivate, Verfahren zu deren Herstellung und diese enthaltende pharmazeutische Präparate | [1982/01] | English: | Pyrano and thiopyrano (3,4-b) indole derivatives, processes for their preparation and pharmaceutical compositions containing them | [1982/01] | French: | Dérivés du pyrano- et thiopyrano(3,4-b)indole, procédés pour leur préparation, et compositions pharmaceutiques les contenant | [1982/01] |
Former [1982/01] | Pyrano- bzw. Thiopyrano(3,4-b)indolderivate, Verfahren und Zwischenprodukte zu deren Herstellung, diese enthaltende pharmazeutische Präparate und ihre Verwendung | ||
Former [1982/01] | Pyrano and thiopyrano (3,4-b) indole derivatives, processes and intermediates for their preparation, pharmaceutical compositions containing them and their use | ||
Former [1982/01] | Dérivés du pyrano- et thiopyrano(3,4-b)indole, procédés et intermédiaires pour leur préparation, compositions pharmaceutiques les contenant et leur application | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 18.04.1980 | Examination requested [1980/14] | 11.09.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.02.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.07.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.10.1982 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.04.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 06.01.1982 | CH | 06.01.1982 | FR | 06.01.1982 | IT | 06.01.1982 | NL | 06.01.1982 | SE | 06.01.1982 | LU | 31.05.1982 | [2002/24] |
Former [1999/52] | BE | 06.01.1982 | |
CH | 06.01.1982 | ||
IT | 06.01.1982 | ||
NL | 06.01.1982 | ||
SE | 06.01.1982 | ||
LU | 31.05.1982 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 06.01.1982 | |
CH | 06.01.1982 | ||
IT | 06.01.1982 | ||
NL | 06.01.1982 | ||
SE | 06.01.1982 | ||
Former [1982/35] | BE | 06.01.1982 | |
CH | 06.01.1982 | ||
NL | 06.01.1982 | ||
SE | 06.01.1982 | ||
Former [1982/31] | BE | 06.01.1982 | |
CH | 06.01.1982 | ||
SE | 06.01.1982 | ||
Former [1982/30] | BE | 06.01.1982 | |
CH | 06.01.1982 | ||
Former [1982/24] | CH | 06.01.1982 | Documents cited: | Search | US4056537 [ ] (DEMERSON CHRISTOPHER A, et al) |