|
27.02.1992 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.1991 |
Transmission of the new certificate for a European patent pursuant to 87 EPC in conjunction with Rule 74 EPC |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.1991 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.09.1991 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.09.1991 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.09.1991 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.1991 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.1991 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.04.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.1991 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.1991 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.04.1991 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.04.1991 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.04.1991 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.03.1991 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.03.1991 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.02.1991 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.02.1991 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.02.1991 |
Decision of the Opposition Division |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.1991 |
Decision of the Opposition Division |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.1991 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.1991 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.1991 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.1991 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.10.1990 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.10.1990 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
17 |
|
09.08.1990 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.08.1990 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.08.1990 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.1990 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.1990 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.1990 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.04.1990 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.04.1990 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.04.1990 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
19 |
|
25.04.1990 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.04.1990 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.04.1990 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.04.1990 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.04.1990 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.04.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.04.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.03.1990 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.03.1990 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.03.1990 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.03.1990 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
01.03.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.02.1990 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.01.1990 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.01.1990 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.01.1990 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.01.1990 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.01.1990 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.1990 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.1990 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.01.1990 |
Annex |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.1988 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.1988 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.07.1988 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.06.1988 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.06.1988 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.06.1988 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.04.1988 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.1988 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.1988 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.04.1988 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.03.1988 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.12.1987 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.12.1987 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.12.1987 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.11.1987 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.10.1987 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
26.10.1987 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
13.10.1987 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.10.1987 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.10.1987 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.09.1987 |
Document concerning appeal fee |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.08.1987 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.08.1987 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.08.1987 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.07.1987 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.07.1987 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.07.1987 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.07.1987 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.07.1987 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.1987 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.06.1987 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
12 |
|
30.06.1987 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.06.1987 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.06.1987 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.04.1987 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.1987 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.1987 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.1987 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.1987 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.1987 |
Communication inviting to file observations after oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.02.1987 |
Communication inviting to file observations after oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.02.1987 |
Communication inviting to file observations after oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.02.1987 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.1987 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
16 |
|
22.01.1987 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.1987 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.01.1987 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
6 |
|
20.01.1987 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.1987 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.1987 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.1987 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.01.1987 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.1987 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.1987 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.1986 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.1986 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.12.1986 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.1986 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.1986 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.1986 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
50 |
|
08.12.1986 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.1986 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.10.1986 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.09.1986 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.09.1986 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.09.1986 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.09.1986 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.09.1986 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.09.1986 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.1986 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.09.1986 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.1986 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.1986 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.1986 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.1986 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.1986 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.1986 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.06.1986 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.1986 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.1986 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
25.04.1986 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.04.1986 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.03.1986 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.1986 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
11.03.1986 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.1986 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.1986 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.1986 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.01.1986 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.01.1986 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.01.1986 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.1985 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.1985 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
25.11.1985 |
Request for documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.1985 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.1985 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.09.1985 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.1985 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.1985 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.08.1985 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.08.1985 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.1985 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.08.1985 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.1985 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.1985 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.07.1985 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.07.1985 |
Communication inviting to file observations after oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.07.1985 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
18 |
|
19.06.1985 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.05.1985 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.05.1985 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.1985 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.05.1985 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
7 |
|
03.05.1985 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.05.1985 |
Description |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.05.1985 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.01.1985 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.01.1985 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.11.1984 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.1984 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.09.1984 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.05.1984 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.05.1984 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.1983 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.1983 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.10.1983 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.09.1983 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.09.1983 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.09.1983 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.06.1983 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.1983 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.1983 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.01.1983 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.01.1983 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.10.1982 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.10.1982 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
08.07.1982 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.05.1982 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.1982 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
22.05.1982 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.04.1982 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.02.1982 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
54 |
|
25.02.1982 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.12.1981 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.1981 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.1981 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.09.1981 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.06.1981 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.03.1981 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.03.1981 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.1981 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.12.1980 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.06.1980 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.1980 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.1980 |
Written request for examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.04.1980 |
Written request for examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.12.1979 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.1979 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.1979 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.1979 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.1979 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.1979 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.1979 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.1979 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.06.1979 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.06.1979 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.06.1979 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.06.1979 |
Deficiency in designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.05.1979 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.05.1979 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.05.1979 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
17.05.1979 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
04.05.1979 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.1979 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.05.1979 |
Description |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
04.05.1979 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.1979 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.1979 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.1979 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
04.05.1979 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.05.1979 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
46 |
|
04.05.1979 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
04.05.1979 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
04.05.1979 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
52 |
|
04.05.1979 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |