EP0005913 - Method of improving the processability of rigid polymers; melts, solutions and shaped articles prepared according to this method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 13.09.1991 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC Imperial Chemical House, Millbank London SW1P 3JF / GB | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cogswell, Frederick Neil 67 Daniells Welwyn Garden City Hertfordshire / GB | 02 /
Tomka, Jira George 43 Spring Lane Harrogate North Yorkshire / GB | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Downer, John Michael, et al ICI Group Patents Services Dept. PO Box 6 Shire Park Bessemer Road Welwyn Garden City Herts, AL7 1HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/05] | Downer, John Michael, et al ICI Group Patents Services Dept. PO Box 6 Shire Park Bessemer Road Welwyn Garden City Herts, AL7 1HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 79300772.5 | 04.05.1979 | Priority number, date | GB19780022954 | 26.05.1978 Original published format: GB 2295478 | GB19780022953 | 26.05.1978 Original published format: GB 2295378 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0005913 | Date: | 12.12.1979 | Language: | EN | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0005913 | Date: | 20.07.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/29] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0005913 | Date: | 30.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.1979 | Classification | IPC: | C08J5/00, B29C47/00, C09K19/00 | [1991/44] | CPC: |
C09K19/3804 (EP,US);
B29C48/022 (EP,US);
C08J5/00 (EP,US);
C09K3/24 (EP,US);
B29C48/05 (EP,US);
B29C48/08 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1983/29] | C08J5/00, B29F3/00, C09K3/34 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Verwertungsverbesserung von steifen Polymeren; Schmelzen, Lösungen und Formkörper verfertigt nach diesem Verfahren | English: | Method of improving the processability of rigid polymers; melts, solutions and shaped articles prepared according to this method | French: | Procédé pour améliorer l'aptitude au traitement d'un polymère rigide; le polymère fondu, solutions et objets conformés fabriqués selon ce procédé | Examination procedure | 16.04.1980 | Examination requested [1980/14] | 04.12.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.05.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.01.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.09.1983
23.01.1984
ADMISSIBLE Bayer AG, Leverkusen Konzernverwaltung RP Patente Konzern Bayerwerk D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | 02
30.11.1983
23.01.1984
ADMISSIBLE BASF Aktiengesellschaft -Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/06] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.09.1983
23.01.1984
ADMISSIBLE Bayer AG, Leverkusen Konzernverwaltung RP Patente Konzern Bayerwerk D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
02
30.11.1983
23.01.1984
ADMISSIBLE BASF Aktiengesellschaft, Ludwigshafen -Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | |||
Former [1983/48] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.09.1983
23.01.1984
ADMISSIBLE Bayer AG, Leverkusen Konzernverwaltung RP Patente Konzern Bayerwerk D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | 25.05.1984 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 20.09.1984 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 08.01.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.1985 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 17.02.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 25.04.1986 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 25.04.1990 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 21.02.1991 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 21.02.1991 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 02.03.1991 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 17.04.1991 | Fee for printing new specification paid | 03.05.1991 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | Appeal following opposition | 27.08.1987 | Appeal received No. T0322/87 | 30.10.1987 | Statement of grounds filed | 25.04.1990 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.04.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 20.07.1983 | AT | 01.08.1983 | [1985/25] |
Former [1983/44] | SE | 20.07.1983 | Documents cited: | Search | BE511763 [ ]; | US3671542 [ ] (KWOLEK STEPHANIE LOUISE); | FR2270282 [ ] (DU PONT [US]); | US4093692 [ ] (HILL DONALD R J) | [ ] - PLASTE UND KAUTSCHUK, 22 Jahrgang, Heft 12, 1975, pages 940-974 Prof. Dr. NIKOLAI I. BASSOW et al.: "Untersuchung des Vibrationsspritz-giessprozesses von Hochpolymeren I". |