EP0005938 - Reducing the effects of radial voids in electrical connections [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.10.1980 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMERACE CORPORATION 555 Fifth Avenue New York, NY 10017 / US | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Anderson, Charles E. R.D. 2, Box 393 D Hackettstown New Jersey / US | 02 /
Simons, Craig W. 14 Rolling View Drive Hackettstown New Jersey / US | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Lynfield, Hubert Geoffrey Gordon, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Isartorplatz 5 D-8000 Munich 2 / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 79300848.3 | 16.05.1979 | Priority number, date | US19780911157 | 31.05.1978 Original published format: US 911157 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0005938 | Date: | 12.12.1979 | Language: | EN | [N/P] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.1979 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/52 | CPC: |
H01R13/53 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE | Title | German: | Verminderung der Wirkungen radialer Hohlräume in elektrischen Verbindungen | English: | Reducing the effects of radial voids in electrical connections | French: | Réduction des effets de vides radiaux dans des connexions électriques | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 14.07.1980 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1981/01] | 24.09.1980 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1981/01] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3930709 [ ] (STANGER ROBERT J, et al); | US3993387 [ ] (VENEZIA J WILLIAM); | US4034151 [ ] (SILVA FRANK A, et al) |