EP0006685 - Process for the manufacture of polyester polyols [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1980/01] | Process for the manufacture of polyester polyols and the preparation of polyurethanes therefrom | ||
[1983/02] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 24.12.1988 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC Imperial Chemical House, Millbank London SW1P 3JF / GB | [1980/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Corry, Alfred Reginald 57 Bowerfold Lane Heaton Norris Stockport, SK4 2LU / GB | [1980/01] | Representative(s) | Stephenson, Kenneth, et al ICI Group Patents Services Dept. PO Box 6 Shire Park Bessemer Road Welwyn Garden City, Herts, AL7 1HD / GB | [1980/01] | Application number, filing date | 79300891.3 | 21.05.1979 | [1980/01] | Priority number, date | GB19780021741 | 24.05.1978 Original published format: GB 2174178 | [1980/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0006685 | Date: | 09.01.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0006685 | Date: | 12.01.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/02] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0006685 | Date: | 08.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.1979 | Classification | IPC: | C08G63/22, C08G18/42 | [1980/01] | CPC: |
C08G63/16 (EP);
C08G18/4236 (EP);
C08G2110/0066 (EP);
C08G2410/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1980/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Polyesterpolyolen | [1983/02] | English: | Process for the manufacture of polyester polyols | [1983/02] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de polyester-polyols | [1983/02] |
Former [1980/01] | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Polyesterpolyolen und hieraus hergestellte Polyurethanen | ||
Former [1980/01] | Process for the manufacture of polyester polyols and the preparation of polyurethanes therefrom | ||
Former [1980/01] | Procédé pour la préparation de polyester-polyols et de polyuréthanes en dérivant | Examination procedure | 13.05.1980 | Examination requested [1980/16] | 12.06.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.07.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
23.09.1983
14.12.1983
ADMISSIBLE BASF Aktiengesellschaft -Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/48] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.09.1983
14.12.1983
ADMISSIBLE BASF Aktiengesellschaft, Ludwigshafen -Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 15.12.1983 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 09.04.1984 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 23.06.1988 | Fee for printing new specification paid | 02.08.1988 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | Appeal following opposition | 25.09.1984 | Appeal received No. T0229/84 | 26.11.1984 | Statement of grounds filed | 04.09.1986 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1986/36] | 11.11.1986 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1986/46] | 01.09.1987 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1987/36] | 30.10.1987 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1987/44] | 26.01.1988 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.04.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |