EP0007771 - Wire stripping tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1980/03] | Wire stripping tools | ||
[1982/38] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bieganski, Zdzislaw Timber Lane Woburn Bedfordshire / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1980/03] | For all designated states Bieganski, Zdzislaw Timber Lane Woburn Bedfordshire / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1980/03] | Representative(s) | Hands, Horace Geoffrey, et al Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London EC1N 2 JT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1980/03] | Hands, Horace Geoffrey, et al GEORGE FUERY & CO Whitehall Chambers 23 Colmore Row Birmingham B3 2BL / GB | Application number, filing date | 79301422.6 | 17.07.1979 | [1980/03] | Priority number, date | GB19310042078 | 27.07.1978 Original published format: GB 3142078 | [1980/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0007771 | Date: | 06.02.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0007771 | Date: | 22.09.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.1979 | Classification | IPC: | H02G1/12 | [1980/03] | CPC: |
H02G1/1212 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1980/03] | Title | German: | Drahtabisolierwerkzeug | [1982/38] | English: | Wire stripping tool | [1982/38] | French: | Outil pour dénuder des fils | [1982/38] |
Former [1980/03] | Drahtabisolierwerkzeuge | ||
Former [1980/03] | Wire stripping tools | ||
Former [1980/03] | Outils pour dénuder des fils | Examination procedure | 03.07.1980 | Examination requested [1980/19] | 20.11.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: {0}) | 25.03.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 08.03.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.06.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 22.09.1982 | NL | 22.09.1982 | SE | 22.09.1982 | [2003/06] |
Former [1983/43] | BE | 22.09.1982 | |
NL | 22.09.1982 | ||
Former [1983/13] | BE | 22.09.1982 | Documents cited: | Search | FR2258727 [ ] (HOLDEMA SA [SE]); | FR2110274 [ ] (IDEAL IND [US]); | US3146645 [ ] (HINDENBURG EUGENE D, et al); | GB1110935 [ ] (BIEGANSKI ZDZISLAW, et al) |