EP0007798 - Fuel injection pump [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For:GB
Ford Motor Company Limited Eagle Way Brentwood Essex CM13 3BW / GB | For:DE
FORD-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 50725 Köln / DE | For:FR
FORD FRANCE SOCIETE ANONYME 344 Avenue Napoléon Bonaparte B.P. 307 92506 Rueil Malmaison Cedex / FR | For:IT
FORD MOTOR COMPANY The American Road Dearborn, MI 48121 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/23] | For:GB
FORD MOTOR COMPANY LIMITED Eagle Way Brentwood, Essex CM13 3BW / GB | ||
For:DE
FORD-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-50725 Köln / DE | |||
For:FR
FORD FRANCE SOCIETE ANONYME 344 Avenue Napoléon Bonaparte B.P. 307 F-92506 Rueil Malmaison Cedex / FR | |||
For:IT
Ford Motor Company The American Road Dearborn, MI 48121 / US | |||
Former [1980/12] | For:GB
FORD MOTOR COMPANY LIMITED Eagle Way Brentwood Essex CM13 3BW / GB | ||
For:DE
FORD-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Ottoplatz 2 Postfach 210369 D-5000 Köln 21 / DE | |||
For:FR
Ford France Société Anonyme 344 Avenue Napoléon Bonaparte B.P. 307 F-92506 Rueil Malmaison Cedex / FR | |||
For:IT
Ford Motor Company Dearborn Wayne Michigan / US | |||
Former [1980/03] | For:GB
FORD MOTOR COMPANY LIMITED Eagle Way Brentwood Essex CM13 3BW / GB | ||
For:DE
Ford - Werke Aktiengesellschaft Ottoplatz 2 Postfach 21 03 69 D-5000 Köln 21 / DE | |||
For:FR
Ford France Société Anonyme 344 Avenue Napoléon Bonaparte B.P. 307 F-92506 Rueil Malmaison Cedex / FR | |||
For:IT
FORD MOTOR COMPANY Dearborn Wayne Michigan / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Simko, Aladar Otto 6091 University Drive Dearborn Heights, Michigan 48127 / US | [1980/03] | Representative(s) | Drakeford, Robert William, et al Ford Motor Company Limited 15/448, Research & Engineering Centre Laindon Basildon Essex SS15 6EE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1980/03] | Drakeford, Robert William, et al Ford Motor Company Limited 15/448, Research & Engineering Centre Laindon Basildon Essex SS15 6EE / GB | Application number, filing date | 79301479.6 | 25.07.1979 | [1980/03] | Priority number, date | US19780928212 | 26.07.1978 Original published format: US 928212 | [1980/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0007798 | Date: | 06.02.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0007798 | Date: | 02.12.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.1979 | Classification | IPC: | F02M59/36, F02M59/04, F02D1/16 | [1980/03] | CPC: |
F02M59/363 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1980/03] | Title | German: | Brennstoffeinspritzpumpe | [1980/03] | English: | Fuel injection pump | [1980/03] | French: | Pompe d'injection de combustible | [1980/03] | Examination procedure | 27.05.1980 | Examination requested [1980/17] | 16.09.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 22.06.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.09.1982 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3319568 [ ] (REPKO LOUIS L, et al); | US3856438 [ ] (SIMKO A); | US3234926 [ ] (MASHINTER WILLIAM H); | US3742925 [ ] (GORDON P, et al); | GB537958 [ ] (ARTHUR FREEMAN SANDERS, et al); | US3648673 [ ] (KNAPE RICHARD S); | US3138112 [ ] (CARLO PORTA, et al) |