EP0008888 - Beta-lactam antibacterial compounds, their preparation and pharmaceutical compositions containing them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.07.1984 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.09.1984 [1984/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BEECHAM GROUP PLC Beecham House, Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9BD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1980/06] | For all designated states BEECHAM GROUP PLC Beecham House Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9BD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bateson, John Hargreaves 6 Cedar House Oakfield Drive Reigate Hill Reigate, Surrey / GB | 02 /
Roberts, Patricia Margaret 15 Bakehouse Road Horley, Surrey / GB | [1980/06] | Representative(s) | Hesketh, Alan, et al European Patent Attorney Beecham Pharmaceuticals Great Burgh Yew Tree Bottom Road Epsom, Surrey, KT18 5XQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/21] | Hesketh, Alan, Dr., et al European Patent Attorney Beecham Pharmaceuticals Great Burgh Yew Tree Bottom Road Epsom, Surrey, KT18 5XQ / GB | ||
Former [1980/06] | Cole, William Gwyn Beecham Pharmaceuticals Yew Tree Bottom Road Epsom Surrey KT18 5XQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 79301646.0 | 14.08.1979 | [1980/06] | Priority number, date | GB19340034378 | 23.08.1978 Original published format: GB 3434378 | [1980/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0008888 | Date: | 19.03.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0008888 | Date: | 21.09.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.1979 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/04, A61K31/40, // (C07D487/04, 205:00, 209:00) | [1980/06] | CPC: |
C07D477/20 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
C07D205/08 (EP);
C07F9/535 (EP);
C07F9/568 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1980/06] | Title | German: | Antibakterielle Beta-Lactam-Verbindungen, ihre Herstellung und sie enthaltende pharmazeutische Zusammensetzungen | [1980/06] | English: | Beta-lactam antibacterial compounds, their preparation and pharmaceutical compositions containing them | [1980/06] | French: | Composés bêta-lactames antibactériens, leur préparation et compositions pharmaceutiques les contenant | [1980/06] | Examination procedure | 19.05.1980 | Examination requested [1980/16] | 22.06.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.07.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 25.01.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.06.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.08.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2652675 [ ] (MERCK & CO INC); | DE2652676 [ ] (MERCK & CO INC); | DE2652680 [ ] (MERCK & CO INC); | DE2751597 [ ] (MERCK & CO INC); | DE2805701 [ ] (MERCK & CO INC); | EP0001627 [ ] (MERCK & CO INC [US]); | EP0001628 [ ] (MERCK & CO INC [US]) |