EP0008925 - In-line apparatus for dissolving a solid in a liquid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOLIDAY INDUSTRIES, INC. 523 E.Rock Island Road Grand Prairie Texas 75050 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1980/06] | For all designated states HOLIDAY INDUSTRIES, INC. 523 E.Rock Island Road Grand Prairie Texas 75050 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
King, Robert Conley 1513 Elms Road Irving Texas / US | [1980/06] | Representative(s) | Harrison, David Christopher, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Harrison, David Christopher, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | ||
Former [1980/06] | Harrison, David Christopher, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 79301769.0 | 29.08.1979 | [1980/06] | Priority number, date | US19780938415 | 31.08.1978 Original published format: US 938415 | [1980/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0008925 | Date: | 19.03.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0008925 | Date: | 02.04.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0008925 | Date: | 18.08.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.1980 | Classification | IPC: | E04H3/20, B01F1/00 | [1982/33] | CPC: |
C02F1/688 (EP,US);
B01F21/22 (EP,US);
B01F25/316 (EP,US);
Y10T137/4891 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1980/06] | E04H3/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1980/06] | Title | German: | Zwischengeschaltete Vorrichtung um Festkörper in einer Flüssigkeit aufzulösen | [1980/06] | English: | In-line apparatus for dissolving a solid in a liquid | [1980/06] | French: | Appareil intercalé pour faire dissoudre une matière solide dans un liquide | [1980/06] | Examination procedure | 15.09.1980 | Examination requested [1980/25] | 26.06.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 17.02.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.05.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 18.08.1982 | FR | 18.08.1982 | NL | 18.08.1982 | SE | 18.08.1982 | AT | 29.08.1982 | CH | 31.08.1982 | LU | 31.08.1982 | DE | 03.05.1983 | [2002/24] |
Former [1999/52] | BE | 18.08.1982 | |
NL | 18.08.1982 | ||
SE | 18.08.1982 | ||
AT | 29.08.1982 | ||
CH | 31.08.1982 | ||
LU | 31.08.1982 | ||
DE | 03.05.1983 | ||
Former [1985/25] | BE | 18.08.1982 | |
NL | 18.08.1982 | ||
SE | 18.08.1982 | ||
AT | 29.08.1982 | ||
CH | 31.08.1982 | ||
DE | 03.05.1983 | ||
Former [1984/35] | BE | 18.08.1982 | |
NL | 18.08.1982 | ||
SE | 18.08.1982 | ||
CH | 31.08.1982 | ||
DE | 03.05.1983 | ||
Former [1983/49] | BE | 18.08.1982 | |
NL | 18.08.1982 | ||
SE | 18.08.1982 | ||
CH | 31.08.1982 | ||
Former [1983/43] | BE | 18.08.1982 | |
NL | 18.08.1982 | ||
SE | 18.08.1982 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB446708 (MINING AND IND WORKS); | US2113203 [ ] (CHRISTIAN STRAUBEL OTTO); | US3292651 [ ] (BORIS INNOCENTI); | US3595395 [ ] (LORENZEN WALTER C); | US3712511 [ ] (MAGNASCO P); | [A]US3899425 (LEWIS KENNETH); | US3929151 [ ] (RUBIN HARRY S) |