EP0009345 - Apparatus for whole picture image processing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1980/07] | Method and system for whole picture image processing | ||
[1986/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.1987 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.11.1987 [1987/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National Biomedical Research Foundation Georgetown University Medical Center 3900 Reservoir Road, N.W. Washington D.C. 20007 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1980/07] | For all designated states National Biomedical Research Foundation Georgetown University Medical Center 3900 Reservoir Road, N.W. Washington D.C. 20007 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ledley, Robert S. 1002 La Grand Road Silver Spring, Maryland / US | [1980/07] | Representative(s) | Wilson, Nicholas Martin, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/35] | Wilson, Nicholas Martin, et al WITHERS & ROGERS 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | ||
Former [1981/01] | Blatchford, William Charles WITHERS & ROGERS 4 Dyers Buildings Holborn London, EC1N 2JT / GB | ||
Former [1980/07] | Wilson, Nicholas Martin WITHERS & ROGERS 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 79301789.8 | 31.08.1979 | [1980/07] | Priority number, date | US19780940052 | 06.09.1978 Original published format: US 940052 | [1980/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0009345 | Date: | 02.04.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0009345 | Date: | 10.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.1980 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/70 | [1986/50] | CPC: |
G06T7/0012 (EP,US);
G06T7/41 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10016 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10116 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30004 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1980/07] | G06F15/20 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1980/07] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung für Totalbildverarbeitung | [1986/50] | English: | Apparatus for whole picture image processing | [1986/50] | French: | Appareil de traitement global d'une image | [1986/50] |
Former [1980/07] | Verfahren und Anlage für Totalbildverarbeitung | ||
Former [1980/07] | Method and system for whole picture image processing | ||
Former [1980/07] | Méthode et système de traitement global d'une image | Examination procedure | 07.08.1980 | Examination requested [1980/22] | 12.08.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.01.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.02.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.04.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 01.04.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 01.04.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.06.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 11.09.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.09.1984 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   10.10.1984 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - IEEE FALL MEETING, Digest of Papers from COMPCON, conference No. 15, 6-9 September 1977. New York LEDLEY "Automatic Texture Analysis of Medical Images", pages 65-71. * From page 66, right-hand column, line 6 to page 71, left-hand column, line 26; figure 6 * |