EP0009974 - Swing post hydraulic circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.1984 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.1991 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 18.12.1991 [1991/51] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
Ford Motor Company Limited Eagle Way Brentwood Essex CM13 3BW / GB | For:DE
FORD-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 50725 Köln / DE | For:FR
FORD FRANCE SOCIETE ANONYME 344 Avenue Napoléon Bonaparte B.P. 307 92506 Rueil Malmaison Cedex / FR | For:BE
NL
SE
FORD MOTOR COMPANY The American Road Dearborn, MI 48121 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/29] | For:GB
FORD MOTOR COMPANY LIMITED Eagle Way Brentwood, Essex CM13 3BW / GB | ||
For:DE
FORD-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-50725 Köln / DE | |||
For:FR
FORD FRANCE SOCIETE ANONYME 344 Avenue Napoléon Bonaparte B.P. 307 F-92506 Rueil Malmaison Cedex / FR | |||
For:BE
NL
SE
Ford Motor Company The American Road Dearborn, MI 48121 / US | |||
Former [1980/12] | For:GB
FORD MOTOR COMPANY LIMITED Eagle Way Brentwood Essex CM13 3BW / GB | ||
For:DE
FORD-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Ottoplatz 2 Postfach 210369 D-5000 Köln 21 / DE | |||
For:FR
Ford France Société Anonyme 344 Avenue Napoléon Bonaparte B.P. 307 F-92506 Rueil Malmaison Cedex / FR | |||
For:BE
NL
SE
Ford Motor Company Dearborn Wayne Michigan / US | |||
Former [1980/08] | For:GB
FORD MOTOR COMPANY LIMITED Eagle Way Brentwood Essex CM13 3BW / GB | ||
For:DE
Ford - Werke Aktiengesellschaft Ottoplatz 2 Postfach 21 03 69 D-5000 Köln 21 / DE | |||
For:FR
Ford France Société Anonyme 344 Avenue Napoléon Bonaparte B.P. 307 F-92506 Rueil Malmaison Cedex / FR | |||
For:BE
NL
SE
FORD MOTOR COMPANY Dearborn Wayne Michigan / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hansen, Charles Alan 4291 Bristol Troy, Michigan 48098 / US | [1980/08] | Representative(s) | Drakeford, Robert William, et al Ford Motor Company Limited 15/448, Research & Engineering Centre Laindon Basildon Essex SS15 6EE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/10] | Drakeford, Robert William, et al Ford Motor Company Limited 15/448, Research & Engineering Centre Laindon Basildon Essex SS15 6EE / GB | ||
Former [1980/08] | Drakeford, Robert William Ford Motor Company Limited Research & Engineering Centre, 15/448 Laindon Basildon Essex SS15 6EE / GB | Application number, filing date | 79302101.5 | 04.10.1979 | [1980/08] | Priority number, date | US19780948597 | 04.10.1978 Original published format: US 948597 | [1980/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0009974 | Date: | 16.04.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0009974 | Date: | 20.07.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.1980 | Classification | IPC: | E02F3/32, F15B15/06 | [1980/08] | CPC: |
F15B15/06 (EP,US);
E02F3/384 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1980/08] | Title | German: | Hydraulischer Kreislauf für Schwenksäule | [1980/08] | English: | Swing post hydraulic circuit | [1980/08] | French: | Circuit hydraulique pour colonne de pivotement | [1980/08] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 18.08.1980 | Examination requested [1980/23] | 12.03.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 26.10.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.04.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 20.07.1983 | BE | 31.10.1983 | [1991/51] |
Former [1983/44] | SE | 20.07.1983 | Documents cited: | Search | GB1297236 [ ]; | GB1377726 [ ] (VOLVO BM); | US4007845 [ ] (WORBACK DAVID L) |