Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0009974 | Global Dossier | 20.07.1983 | B1 | EP0009974 | 16.04.1980 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US94859778 | 04.10.1978 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1115175 | 29.12.1981 | A | Priority number | Date | US94859778 | 04.10.1978 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE2965940D1 | 25.08.1983 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US94859778 | 04.10.1978 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS5836132B | 06.08.1983 | B2 | JPS5552435 | 16.04.1980 | A | Priority number | Date | US94859778 | 04.10.1978 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4201509 | 06.05.1980 | A | Priority number | Date | US94859778 | 04.10.1978 |