EP0010412 - Denture cleansing composition and process for its preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 26.09.1987 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.1987 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 11.11.1987 [1987/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RECKITT AND COLMAN PRODUCTS LIMITED P.O. Box 26 1-17, Burlington Lane London W4 2RW / GB | [1980/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bogie, Kenneth David 21, Skirbeck Road Gillshill Road James Reckitt Av. Hull N. Humberside / GB | [1980/09] | Representative(s) | Oulton, Richard John, et al H.L. COTTRELL & CO. Kings Building South Church Side Hull North Humberside HU1 1RR. / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1980/09] | Oulton, Richard John, et al H.L. COTTRELL & CO. Kings Building South Church Side Hull North Humberside HU1 1RR. / GB | Application number, filing date | 79302199.9 | 12.10.1979 | [1980/09] | Priority number, date | ZA19780005772 | 13.10.1978 Original published format: ZA 785772 | [1980/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0010412 | Date: | 30.04.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0010412 | Date: | 03.11.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/44] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0010412 | Date: | 11.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.1980 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/30 | [1980/09] | CPC: |
A61Q11/02 (EP);
A61K8/0216 (EP);
A61K8/22 (EP);
A61K2800/222 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1980/09] | Title | German: | Reinigungsmittel-Zusammensetzung für Zahnprothesen und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [1980/09] | English: | Denture cleansing composition and process for its preparation | [1980/09] | French: | Composition de nettoyage pour dentiers et procédé pour sa préparation | [1980/09] | Examination procedure | 03.10.1980 | Examination requested [1981/01] | 09.01.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.07.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 06.05.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | Appeal received No. T91/85 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
28.05.1983
20.06.1983
ADMISSIBLE Blendax GmbH Rheinallee 88 Postfach 15 80 D-55005 Mainz / DE | 02
14.07.1983
02.09.1983
ADMISSIBLE Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien TFP / Patentabteilung D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/38] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
28.05.1983
20.06.1983
ADMISSIBLE Blendax GmbH Rheinallee 88 Postfach 15 80 D-55005 Mainz / DE | ||
02
14.07.1983
02.09.1983
ADMISSIBLE Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien TFP / Patentabteilung D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
Former [1983/32] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
28.05.1983
20.06.1983
ADMISSIBLE Blendax GmbH Rheinallee 88 Postfach 15 80 D-55005 Mainz / DE | 05.09.1983 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 12.03.1984 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 16.06.1987 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 31.08.1987 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 21.03.1985 | Appeal received No. T0091/85 | 24.06.1985 | Statement of grounds filed | 27.01.1987 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.01.1987 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR1428137 [ ]; | AT264015B [ ] (KRUG RUTH [DE]); | CH465114 [ ] (TINTEX CORP [US]); | GB1292482 [ ] (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US]); | DE2312847 [ ] (KRISP KG KUKIROL) |