Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0010894
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
19.06.1984 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 22.08.1984 [1984/34] |
18.10.1983 |
Change - representative |
published on 21.12.1983 [1983/51] |
04.06.1983 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 03.08.1983 [1983/31] |
02.12.1981 |
Change - applicant |
published on 03.02.1982 [1982/05] |
02.12.1981 |
Change - representative |
published on 03.02.1982 [1982/05] |
19.06.1980 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 20.08.1980 [1980/17] |
07.05.1980 |
Change - applicant |
published on 09.07.1980 [1980/14] |
18.03.1980 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 14.05.1980 [1980/10] |