Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE4383T | 15.08.1983 | T1 | Priority number | Date | GB7840706 | 16.10.1978 | EP79302212 | 15.10.1979 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0010894 | Global Dossier | 03.08.1983 | B1 | EP0010894 | 14.05.1980 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB7840706 | 16.10.1978 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1218066 | 17.02.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | GB7840706 | 16.10.1978 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE2966030D1 | 08.09.1983 | D1 | Priority number | Date | GB7840706 | 16.10.1978 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS5553288 | 18.04.1980 | A | Priority number | Date | GB7840706 | 16.10.1978 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4374836 | 22.02.1983 | A | Priority number | Date | GB7840706 | 16.10.1978 |